Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0859590

EP0859590 - COSMETIC COMPOSITION INCLUDING AT LEAST ONE SILICONE-GRAFTED POLYMER AND AT LEAST ONE POLYSILOXANE-POLYOXYALKYLENE LINEAR BLOCK COPOLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  11.09.2009
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DE, FR, GB, IT
published on 03.02.2010  [2010/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1998/35]For all designated states
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / DUBIEF, Claude
9, rue Edmond-Rostang
F-78150 Le Chesnay / FR
02 / DUPUIS, Christine
15, rue Seveste
F-75018 Paris / FR
03 / CAUWET-MARTIN, Danièle
53, rue de Charonne
F-75011 Paris / FR
[1998/35]
Representative(s)Le Blainvaux Bellegarde, Françoise
L'Oréal
Service DIPI
9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus
92110 Clichy / FR
[N/P]
Former [1998/35]Le Blainvaux Bellegarde, Françoise
L'OREAL, Centre de Recherche Charles Zviak, Département Propriété Industrielle, 90, rue du Général Roguet
92583 Clichy Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date96931851.816.09.1996
[1998/35]
WO1996FR01433
Priority number, dateFR1995001147929.09.1995         Original published format: FR 9511479
[1998/35]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9712593
Date:10.04.1997
Language:FR
[1997/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0859590
Date:26.08.1998
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.1997
[1998/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0859590
Date:19.12.2001
Language:FR
[2001/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/48, A61K7/06
[1998/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/35]
TitleGerman:EINE MINDESTENS EIN GEPFROPFTES SILIKONPOLYMER UND MINDESTENS EIN LINEARES POLYSILOXANPOLYALKYLEN BLOCKPOLYMER ENTHALTENDE KOSMETISCHE ZUBEREITUNG[2001/14]
English:COSMETIC COMPOSITION INCLUDING AT LEAST ONE SILICONE-GRAFTED POLYMER AND AT LEAST ONE POLYSILOXANE-POLYOXYALKYLENE LINEAR BLOCK COPOLYMER[1998/35]
French:COMPOSITION COSMETIQUE COMPRENANT AU MOINS UN POLYMERE SILICONE GREFFE ET AU MOINS UN COPOLYMERE BLOC LINEAIRE POLYSILOXANE-POLYOXYALKYLENE[1998/35]
Former [1998/35]EINE MINDESTENS EIN GEPROFTES SILIKONPOLYMER UND MINDESTENS EIN LINEARES POLYSILOXANPOLYALKYLEN BLOCKPOLYMER ENTHALTENDES KOSMETISCHE ZUBEREITUNG
Entry into regional phase29.04.1998National basic fee paid 
29.04.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
29.04.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.03.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.04.1998Examination requested  [1998/35]
05.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.06.2001Fee for grant paid
08.06.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.06.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.08.2002  12.09.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
VTP Patente
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2009/26]
Former [2002/42]
Opponent(s)01  27.08.2002   
Henkel KGaA
VTP (Patente)
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
24.10.2002Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.05.2003Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.10.2004Date of oral proceedings
24.11.2004Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.11.2004Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
14.06.2007Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
31.08.2007Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
28.08.2008Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
13.05.2009Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.07.2009
13.05.2009Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.05.2009Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
06.06.2009Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/42]
07.07.2009Date of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition21.01.2005Appeal received No.  T0130/05
26.03.2005Statement of grounds filed
14.06.2007Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
14.06.2007Date of oral proceedings
29.06.2007Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI19.12.2001
IE16.09.2002
LU16.09.2002
DK30.09.2002
PT31.03.2003
MC01.04.2003
GR04.04.2003
AT16.09.2004
SE17.09.2004
BE30.09.2004
CH30.09.2004
LI30.09.2004
NL01.04.2005
GB16.09.2008
IT16.09.2008
FR30.09.2008
DE01.04.2009
[2010/05]
Former [2006/44]FI19.12.2001
IE16.09.2002
LU16.09.2002
DK30.09.2002
PT31.03.2003
MC01.04.2003
GR04.04.2003
AT16.09.2004
SE17.09.2004
BE30.09.2004
CH30.09.2004
LI30.09.2004
NL01.04.2005
Former [2006/14]FI19.12.2001
IE16.09.2002
LU16.09.2002
DK30.09.2002
PT31.03.2003
GR04.04.2003
AT16.09.2004
SE17.09.2004
BE30.09.2004
CH30.09.2004
LI30.09.2004
NL01.04.2005
Former [2006/12]FI19.12.2001
IE16.09.2002
LU16.09.2002
DK30.09.2002
PT31.03.2003
GR04.04.2003
AT16.09.2004
SE17.09.2004
BE30.09.2004
CH30.09.2004
LI30.09.2004
Former [2005/51]FI19.12.2001
IE16.09.2002
LU16.09.2002
DK30.09.2002
PT31.03.2003
GR04.04.2003
AT16.09.2004
SE17.09.2004
BE30.09.2004
Former [2005/23]FI19.12.2001
IE16.09.2002
LU16.09.2002
DK30.09.2002
PT31.03.2003
GR04.04.2003
SE17.09.2004
Former [2004/39]FI19.12.2001
IE16.09.2002
LU16.09.2002
DK30.09.2002
PT31.03.2003
GR04.04.2003
Former [2003/47]FI19.12.2001
IE16.09.2002
DK30.09.2002
PT31.03.2003
GR04.04.2003
Former [2003/43]FI19.12.2001
IE16.09.2002
PT31.03.2003
GR04.04.2003
Former [2003/42]FI19.12.2001
IE16.09.2002
GR04.04.2003
Former [2003/31]FI19.12.2001
GR04.04.2003
Former [2002/33]FI19.12.2001
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0635258  (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-49 * claim - *;
 [A]EP0492657  (NIPPON UNICAR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-49 * claim - *;
 [A]EP0643961  (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-49 * claim - *;
 [A]FR2709955  (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-49 * claim - *;
 [A]EP0125779  (DOW CORNING [US]) [A] 1-49 * claim - *;
 [DA]EP0412704  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [DA] 1-49 * claim - *;
 [DA]EP0412707  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [DA] 1-49 * claim - *;
 [DA]EP0582152  (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [DA] 1-49 * claim - *;
 [DA]WO9503776  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [DA] 1-49 * claim - *;
 [DA]WO9323009  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [DA] 1-49 * claim - *;
 [DA]WO9323446  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [DA] 1-49 * claim - *;
 EP0640105  [ ] (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US])