Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0857079 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0857079



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1111
25.04.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
03.03.2008 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
18.02.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
03.01.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.01.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.12.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.12.2007 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 18
19.12.2007 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
08.11.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
07.11.2007 Claims Appeal 3
07.11.2007 Claims Appeal 3
07.11.2007 Claims Appeal 2
07.11.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
07.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
07.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 110
07.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.11.2007 Non-scannable object Appeal 2
07.11.2007 Non-scannable object Appeal 2
07.11.2007 Non-scannable object Appeal 2
07.11.2007 Non-scannable object Appeal 6
07.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
07.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.11.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 5
06.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
06.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
06.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
05.11.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 111
05.11.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 15
05.11.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
05.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
05.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
05.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
05.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
05.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
05.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.11.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.11.2007 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 19
04.07.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.06.2007 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.06.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.06.2007 Claims Appeal 3
26.06.2007 Claims Appeal 3
26.06.2007 Claims Appeal 4
26.06.2007 Claims Appeal 4
26.06.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
25.06.2007 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 8
25.06.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 26
20.06.2007 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
14.02.2007 Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
01.06.2006 Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
15.03.2006 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 2
25.08.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.08.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 22
18.08.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 34
18.08.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.08.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
18.08.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
18.08.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
18.08.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.08.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
18.08.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
18.08.2005 Non-scannable object Appeal 5
18.08.2005 Non-scannable object Appeal 2
18.08.2005 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 28
08.04.2005 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
06.04.2005 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
04.04.2005 Claims Appeal 3
04.04.2005 Claims Appeal 3
04.04.2005 Non-scannable object Appeal 3
04.04.2005 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 13
30.03.2005 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 24
29.03.2005 Claims Appeal 3
29.03.2005 Claims Appeal 3
29.03.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.03.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
29.03.2005 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 13
22.02.2005 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.02.2005 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
11.02.2005 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
11.02.2005 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
31.01.2005 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
28.01.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
26.01.2005 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
23.11.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.11.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.11.2004 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
19.11.2004 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
19.11.2004 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
19.11.2004 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 6
19.11.2004 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 2
19.11.2004 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
27.09.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.09.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.09.2004 Claims Opposition 2
15.09.2004 Claims Opposition 2
15.09.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
13.09.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 10
13.09.2004 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
27.04.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.04.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.04.2004 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.04.2004 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.04.2004 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.04.2004 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.04.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.03.2004 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
31.03.2004 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
31.03.2004 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
31.03.2004 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 2
11.08.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.07.2003 Claims Opposition 3
31.07.2003 Claims Opposition 2
31.07.2003 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
29.07.2003 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 15
09.07.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.07.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
01.07.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
30.06.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
07.05.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.05.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
30.04.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
30.04.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
29.04.2003 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
19.12.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
19.12.2002 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
21.11.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.11.2002 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
14.11.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.11.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
14.11.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
30.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 39
30.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
30.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
30.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.10.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.10.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
30.10.2002 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
30.10.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
30.10.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
30.10.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
30.10.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
30.10.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
30.10.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
30.10.2002 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.02.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
04.02.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
01.02.2002 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 5
29.01.2002 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 6
23.01.2002 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 6
18.01.2002 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 6
20.12.2001 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
09.08.2001 Communication regarding the forthcoming grant Search / examination 2
19.04.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.04.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
19.04.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
18.04.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 6
08.01.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
22.12.2000 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
15.12.2000 Description Search / examination 2
15.12.2000 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
12.12.2000 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
05.12.2000 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
06.10.2000 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
02.10.2000 Decision to refuse (Formalities Officer) Search / examination 1
03.07.2000 Grant of extension of time limit Search / examination 1
23.06.2000 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 1
21.06.2000 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 2
14.02.2000 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
14.02.2000 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
02.02.2000 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
01.07.1998 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
11.06.1998 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.05.1998 Claims Search / examination 2
25.05.1998 Description Search / examination 10
25.05.1998 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
25.05.1998 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
15.05.1998 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 19
05.02.1998 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 14
05.02.1998 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
26.06.1997 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
24.04.1997 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
24.04.1997 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 16
24.04.1997 Priority document Search / examination 22