EP0794201 - RAW MATERIAL FOR THE PRODUCTION OF HEAT-RESISTANT RESIN, HEAT-RESISTANT RESIN AND PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF THE RESIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/37] | For all designated states NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD. 1-1, Koraibashi, 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANTO, Teruyuki 931-11, Hamada Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-12 / JP | 02 /
UEDA, Kenichi 931-11, Hamada Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-12 / JP | 03 /
FUJIOKA, Kazumi 752-3, Ota Taishicho Ibo-gun Hyogo 671-15 / JP | 04 /
KISHINO, Kazuo 4-3, Nishiimajyuku 4-chome Himeji-shi Hyogo 670 / JP | [1997/37] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/37] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96931981.3 | 25.09.1996 | [1997/37] | WO1996JP02763 | Priority number, date | JP19950249277 | 27.09.1995 Original published format: JP 24927795 | JP19960202445 | 31.07.1996 Original published format: JP 20244596 | [1997/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9711978 | Date: | 03.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0794201 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0794201 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.04.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08F222/40, C08F220/14, C07D207/44 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
C08F222/402 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/37] | C08F222/40, C08F220/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/37] | Title | German: | AUSGANGSPRODUKT ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WÄRMEBESTÄNDIGEM HARZ, WÄRMEBESTÄNDIGES HARZ UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES HARZES | [1997/37] | English: | RAW MATERIAL FOR THE PRODUCTION OF HEAT-RESISTANT RESIN, HEAT-RESISTANT RESIN AND PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF THE RESIN | [1997/37] | French: | MATIERE PREMIERE DESTINEE A LA PRODUCTION D'UNE RESINE RESISTANTE A LA CHALEUR, RESINE RESISTANTE A LA CHALEUR ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE CETTE RESINE | [1997/37] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.1997 | Translation filed | 22.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.1997 | Search fee paid | 22.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/37] | 06.04.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 12.11.2003 | ES | 23.02.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/46] | ES | 23.02.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05310853 ; | JPH05310853 [ ]; | [PX]JPH07330723 ; | JPH07330723 [ ]; | [X]JPS62234063 ; | JPS62234063 [ ]; | [X]EP0208291 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [X] 4-6 * abstract * * column 3, line 1 - line 13 * * column 3, line 38 - line 41 * * examples 4,7,8,13,14,17 * * claims 1,3 *; | [X]EP0257831 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * page 3, line 22 - line 26 * * page 4, line 3 - line 7 * * page 4, line 24 - line 35 * * page 4, line 49 - line 52 * * page 5, line 11 - line 14 * * page 5, line 24 - line 27 * * page 4, line 36 - line 46 * * examples 1,2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940228), vol. 018, no. 122, Database accession no. (C - 1173), & JP05310853 A 19931122 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO LTD) [X] 2-11 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, & JPH05310853 A 19931122 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) [ ] * abstract * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 1996, no. 04, & JP07330723 A 19951219 (DAI ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD) [PX] 2 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, & JPH07330723 A 19951219 (DAI ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD) [ ] * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880405), vol. 012, no. 103, Database accession no. (C - 485), & JP62234063 A 19871014 (NIPPON OIL & FATS CO LTD) [X] 7,8 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, & JPS62234063 A 00000000 (NIPPON OILS& FATS CO LTD) [ ] * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH03170515 (KURARAY CO); | [X]JPH0472302 (SUN ARROW KAGAKU KK); | [X]JPH0586105 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND); | [X]JPH05247145 (TOSOH CORP); | [X]JPH05310843 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO); | [X]JPH0641249 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [X]JPH06116331 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [X]JP6088971B |