EP0851845 - THIN SiO 2 FILMS, A PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THEM AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT FÜR NEUE MATERIALIEN gemeinnützige GmbH Universität des Saarlandes, Gebäude 43, Im Stadtwald 66123 Saarbrücken / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/28] | For all designated states INSTITUT FÜR NEUE MATERIALIEN gemeinnützige GmbH Universität des Saarlandes, Gebäude 43, Im Stadtwald 66123 Saarbrücken / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Helmut Im Königsfeld 27 D-66130 Saarbrücken / DE | 02 /
MENNIG, Martin Mittelstrasse 5 D-66287 Quierschied / DE | 03 /
JONSCHKER, Gerhard Grünewaldstrasse 12 D-66583 Spiesen-Elversberg / DE | 04 /
SUYAL, Navin Im Allment 21 D-66125 Saarbrücken / DE | [1998/28] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/28] | Barz, Peter, Dr. Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96932547.1 | 17.09.1996 | [1998/28] | WO1996EP04069 | Priority number, date | DE1995134764 | 19.09.1995 Original published format: DE 19534764 | DE1995134980 | 20.09.1995 Original published format: DE 19534980 | [1998/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9711035 | Date: | 27.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0851845 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0851845 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C03C1/00, C03B19/12 | [1998/28] | CPC: |
B01D67/0048 (EP,KR,US);
B01D67/0041 (EP,KR);
B01D67/00413 (US);
B01D71/02 (EP);
B01D71/027 (KR);
B01D71/04 (EP,KR,US);
C03B19/12 (EP,KR,US);
C03C1/008 (EP,KR,US);
C04B35/14 (EP,KR,US);
C04B35/62218 (EP,KR,US);
C04B35/626 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2323/08 (EP,KR);
B01D2323/081 (US);
B01D2323/36 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2325/04 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/31663 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1998/28] | Title | German: | DÜNNE SiO 2-FOLIEN, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [1998/28] | English: | THIN SiO 2 FILMS, A PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THEM AND THEIR USE | [1998/28] | French: | FILMS MINCES DE SiO 2, PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DESDITS FILMS ET LEUR UTILISATION | [1998/28] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/28] | 13.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 30.05.2001 | IT | 30.05.2001 | NL | 30.05.2001 | SE | 30.08.2001 | AT | 17.09.2001 | LU | 17.09.2001 | ES | 18.09.2001 | BE | 30.09.2001 | CH | 30.09.2001 | LI | 30.09.2001 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/39] | GB | 30.05.2001 | |
NL | 30.05.2001 | ||
SE | 30.08.2001 | ||
AT | 17.09.2001 | ||
LU | 17.09.2001 | ||
ES | 18.09.2001 | ||
BE | 30.09.2001 | ||
CH | 30.09.2001 | ||
LI | 30.09.2001 | ||
Former [2004/28] | GB | 30.05.2001 | |
NL | 30.05.2001 | ||
SE | 30.08.2001 | ||
AT | 17.09.2001 | ||
ES | 18.09.2001 | ||
BE | 30.09.2001 | ||
CH | 30.09.2001 | ||
LI | 30.09.2001 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GB | 30.05.2001 | |
NL | 30.05.2001 | ||
SE | 30.08.2001 | ||
AT | 17.09.2001 | ||
BE | 30.09.2001 | ||
CH | 30.09.2001 | ||
LI | 30.09.2001 | ||
Former [2003/06] | GB | 30.05.2001 | |
NL | 30.05.2001 | ||
SE | 30.08.2001 | ||
BE | 30.09.2001 | ||
CH | 30.09.2001 | ||
LI | 30.09.2001 | ||
Former [2003/01] | GB | 30.05.2001 | |
SE | 30.08.2001 | ||
CH | 30.09.2001 | ||
LI | 30.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/16] | GB | 30.05.2001 | |
SE | 30.08.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 30.08.2001 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS62297232 ; | [A]JPH0337138 ; | [X]DE3142383 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 10, paragraph 2 * * page 16, paragraph 2 *; | [A]EP0292179 (CORNING GLASS WORKS [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 3, line 48 - page 4, line 12 ** page 6, line 17 - line 19 *; | [X]US5049338 (VARAPRASAD DESARAJU V [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 5 *; | [PX]EP0719735 (AT & T CORP [US]) [PX] 1-8 * page 2, line 55 - page 3, line 30 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880603), vol. 012, no. 191, Database accession no. (C - 501), & JP62297232 A 19871224 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1-8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910426), vol. 015, no. 167, Database accession no. (C - 0827), & JP03037138 A 19910218 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract * |