blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0873468

EP0873468 - ROTARY VALVE CONTROL SYSTEM FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES AND RECIPROCATING PUMPS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.03.2004
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.04.2004  [2004/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bartos, Franz Stanislav
Rozenbergstrasse 26
74395 Mundelsheim / DE
[1998/44]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/44]
Representative(s)Bögl, Wolfgang
Hölderlinstrasse 16
74395 Mundelsheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/44]Bögl, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Hölderlinstrasse 16
74395 Mundelsheim / DE
Application number, filing date96932597.626.09.1996
[1998/44]
WO1996EP04194
Priority number, dateDE199513592027.09.1995         Original published format: DE 19535920
[1998/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9712128
Date:03.04.1997
Language:DE
[1997/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0873468
Date:28.10.1998
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0873468
Date:02.05.2003
Language:DE
[2003/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.04.1997
ClassificationIPC:F01L7/08, F01L7/02
[1998/44]
CPC:
F01L7/028 (EP,US); F01L7/10 (EP,US); F02B2075/027 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/44]
TitleGerman:DREHSCHIEBERSTEUERUNG FÜR VERBRENNUNGSMASCHINEN UND KOLBENPUMPEN[1998/44]
English:ROTARY VALVE CONTROL SYSTEM FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES AND RECIPROCATING PUMPS[1998/44]
French:SYSTEME DE COMMANDE A VANNE ROTATIVE POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE ET POMPES A PISTON[1998/44]
Entry into regional phase07.07.1998National basic fee paid 
07.07.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.03.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.07.1998Examination requested  [1998/44]
23.07.1998Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
15.09.1998Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, LI, NL, PT, SE
06.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.11.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.04.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.2001Fee for grant paid
27.07.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
19.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
13.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
12.06.1998AT   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.1998BE   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.1998CH   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.1998DE   M01   Fee paid on   11.08.1998
12.06.1998ES   M01   Fee paid on   11.08.1998
12.06.1998FR   M01   Fee paid on   11.08.1998
12.06.1998GB   M01   Fee paid on   11.08.1998
12.06.1998IT   M01   Fee paid on   11.08.1998
12.06.1998NL   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.1998PT   M01   Not yet paid
12.06.1998SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
12.06.1998M01   Fee paid on   07.07.1998
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.199904   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2000
30.09.200005   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2001
30.09.200106   M06   Fee paid on   19.03.2002
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[AD]DE4312492  (BARTOS STANISLAV FRANZ [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]BE531687  (TACCONI) [A] 1 * page 1, lines 19-38 * * figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.