Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0797435

EP0797435 - CONTROLLED RELEASE MATRIX FOR PHARMACEUTICALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2004
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Euro-Celtique S.A.
122 Boulevard de la Petrusse
Luxemburg / LU
[1997/40]
Inventor(s)01 / KRISHNAMURTHY, Thinnayam Naganathan
575 Granite Court
Ontario L1W 3W8 / CA
[1997/40]
Representative(s)Ruffles, Graham Keith
Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge
CB2 1LA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/40]Ruffles, Graham Keith
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date96932782.401.10.1996
[1997/40]
WO1996IB01130
Priority number, dateUS1995053739202.10.1995         Original published format: US 537392
[1997/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9712605
Date:10.04.1997
Language:EN
[1997/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0797435
Date:01.10.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.1997
[1997/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0797435
Date:03.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/20
[1997/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/40]
TitleGerman:MATRIX ZUR GESTEUERTEN FREISETZUNG VON ARZNEISTOFFEN[1997/40]
English:CONTROLLED RELEASE MATRIX FOR PHARMACEUTICALS[1997/40]
French:MATRICE A LIBERATION REGULEE POUR PRODUITS PHARMACEUTIQUES[1997/40]
Entry into regional phase01.07.1997National basic fee paid 
01.07.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/40]
12.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2003Fee for grant paid
27.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.06.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
20.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
18.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
19.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
17.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipMC22.01.2004
[2005/02]
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9505808  (ABBOT LABORATORIES) [A] 1,4-8,12-16,22,23 * claim 1 * * page 4, line 26 - line 33 * * page 5, line 4 - line 7 * * page 9; example 10 *;
 [A]US4717713  (JOEL L. ZATZ ET AL.) [A] 1,4,5,7,8,12-17,22-24 * column 3, line 27 - column 5, line 23 *;
 [A]EP0097523  (EUROCELTIQUE) [A] 1-11,18-24 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9310765  (EUROCELTIQUE) [A] 1-11,18-24 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS4792452
 WO9626717