Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0802182

EP0802182 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING N-(D-alpha-METHYL-beta-MERCAPTOPROPIONYL)-L-PROLINE AND INTERMEDIATES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1997/43]PROCESS FOR PRODUCING N-(D-$g(a)-METHYL-$g(b)-MERCAPTOPROPIONYL)-L-PROLINE AND INTERMEDIATES THEREOF
[1999/52]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.07.2004
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.08.2004  [2004/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KANEKA CORPORATION
2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome
Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/35]For all designated states
KANEKA CORPORATION
2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP
Former [1997/43]For all designated states
KANEKA CORPORATION
2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / UEDA, Yasuyoshi
140-15, Waku Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi
Hyogo 671-12 / JP
02 / KANOU, Fumihiko
Roiyarukopo Kuriyamacho 1004 53, Kuriyamacho
Himeji-shi Hyogo 670 / JP
03 / KINOSHITA, Koichi
1-13-2-405, Nishihata Takasago-shi
Hyogo 676 / JP
04 / OKUBO, Takahiro
3-3-26-103, Nishiakashikitamachi Akashi-shi
Hyogo 673 / JP
[1997/43]
Representative(s)Hubert, Philippe , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1997/43]Hubert, Philippe , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date96932825.107.10.1996
[1997/43]
WO1996JP02902
Priority number, dateJP1995028688606.10.1995         Original published format: JP 28688695
JP1996012272719.04.1996         Original published format: JP 12272796
[1997/43]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9712858
Date:10.04.1997
Language:EN
[1997/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0802182
Date:22.10.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.1997
[1997/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0802182
Date:27.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP10.04.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07D207/16
[1997/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL [1997/43]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON N-(D-alpha-METHYL-beta-MERCAPTOPROPIONYL)-L-PROLIN UND INTERMEDIATEN DAVON[1999/52]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING N-(D-alpha-METHYL-beta-MERCAPTOPROPIONYL)-L-PROLINE AND INTERMEDIATES THEREOF[1999/52]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE N-(D-alpha-METHYLE-beta-MERCAPTOPROPIONYLE)-L-PROLINE ET DE SES INTERMEDIAIRES[1999/52]
Former [1997/43]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON N-(D--G(A)-METHYL--G(B)-MERCAPTOPROPIONYL)-L-PROLIN UND INTERMEDIATEN DAVON
Former [1997/43]PROCESS FOR PRODUCING N-(D-$g(a)-METHYL-$g(b)-MERCAPTOPROPIONYL)-L-PROLINE AND INTERMEDIATES THEREOF
Former [1997/43]PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE N-(D-$g(a)-METHYLE-$g(b)-MERCAPTOPROPIONYLE)-L-PROLINE ET DE SES INTERMEDIAIRES
Entry into regional phase04.07.1997Translation filed 
03.07.1997National basic fee paid 
03.07.1997Search fee paid 
03.07.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
01.10.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.10.1997Examination requested  [1997/49]
16.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2003Fee for grant paid
27.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
20.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
26.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
29.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[AD]US5387697  (HEN AZUCENA C [US]) [AD] 1,7,15,19,24 * the whole document *
 [AD]  D.W.CUSHMAN ET AL., "Design of potent competitive inhibitors of angiotensin-converting enzyme. Carboxyalkanoyl and mercaptoalkanoyl amino acids", BIOCHEMISTRY., AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, PA., US, (1977), vol. 16, no. 25, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 5484 - 5491, XP002152458 [AD] 1,7,15,19,24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00644a014
International search[A]JPH0710835  (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK);
 [A]JPH0680628  (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO);
 [A]JPH04305565  (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO);
 [A]JPS6345252  (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD)