Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0934232

EP0934232 - PROCESS FOR DISINFECTING ORGANIC WASTE SLUDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.03.2009
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 22.06.2011  [2011/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Peltier, Morris Jr.
1140 Honeycomb Drive
Cade, LA 70519 / US
For all designated states
Mayeux, Eddie P.
125 Walker Gravel Pit Road
Dry Prong, LA 71423 / US
[1999/32]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1999/32]
Representative(s)Barker, Rosemary Anne , et al
HGF Limited
4th Floor, Merchant Exchange
17-19 Whitworth Street West
Manchester M1 5WG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/39]Barker, Rosemary Anne , et al
Harrison Goddard Foote Orlando House 11c Compstall Road Marple Bridge
Stockport SK6 5HH / GB
Former [1999/32]Goddard, David John , et al
Harrison Goddard Foote, 1 Stockport Road, Marple
Stockport SK6 6BD / GB
Application number, filing date96933047.111.09.1996
[1999/32]
WO1996US14961
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9811023
Date:19.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0934232
Date:11.08.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.1998
[1999/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0934232
Date:14.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.03.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C02F1/50, C02F11/00
[1999/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/32]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR DESINFEKTION VON ORGANISCHEM ABFALLSCHLAMM[1999/32]
English:PROCESS FOR DISINFECTING ORGANIC WASTE SLUDGE[1999/32]
French:PROCEDE DE DEPARASITAGE DE BOUE RESIDUAIRE ORGANIQUE[1999/32]
Entry into regional phase12.04.1999National basic fee paid 
12.04.1999Search fee paid 
12.04.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
12.04.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.04.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
12.04.1999Examination requested  [1999/32]
12.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.09.2007
14.08.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
25.09.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
20.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.2008Fee for grant paid
28.03.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.02.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
07.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
10.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
26.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
05.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
08.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 11
03.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
12.04.199903   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.1999
30.09.200712   M06   Fee paid on   03.12.2007
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.05.2008
BE14.05.2008
DK14.05.2008
FI14.05.2008
SE14.08.2008
GR15.08.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
PT14.10.2008
[2011/25]
Former [2010/05]AT14.05.2008
BE14.05.2008
DK14.05.2008
FI14.05.2008
SE14.08.2008
CH30.09.2008
LI30.09.2008
PT14.10.2008
Former [2009/12]AT14.05.2008
BE14.05.2008
DK14.05.2008
FI14.05.2008
SE14.08.2008
PT14.10.2008
Former [2009/08]AT14.05.2008
DK14.05.2008
FI14.05.2008
SE14.08.2008
Former [2009/07]AT14.05.2008
FI14.05.2008
SE14.08.2008
Former [2008/49]AT14.05.2008
FI14.05.2008
Documents cited:Search[XA]ZA9206552  ;
 [XA]JPS5332122  ;
 [A]JPH08231311
 [XA]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 36, Database accession no. 1993-288730, XP002123520 & ZA9206552 A 19930526 (SCHOOLING L L) [X] 1-5,8 * abstract * [A] 6,7,9-34
 [XA]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1978, no. 19, Database accession no. 1978-33894A, XP002123521 & JPS5332122 A 19780327 (TOKYO ORGANIC CHEM IND CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-34
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 46, Database accession no. 1996-461221, XP002123522 & JPH08231311 A 19960910 (FUJI SANGYO CO LTD) [A] 1-34 * abstract *
International search[A]US5077314  (PHILIPS JUDSON C [US], et al);
 [A]US4935447  (PHILIPS JUDSON C [US], et al);
 [A]US4732684  (FUJINO KIYOHARU [JP]);
 [A]US4729831  (FUJINO KIYOHARU [JP]);
 [A]US4067896  (PIERCE JAMES K);
 [A]US3942970  (O'DONNELL JAMES M)