blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0793588
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3808507BGlobal Dossier 16.08.2006B2
JPH10513417 22.12.1998A
Priority number Date
DE29515703 02.10.1995
EP9604235 27.09.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0793588Global Dossier 12.04.2000B1
EP0793588 10.09.1997A1
Priority number Date
DE29515703 02.10.1995
EP9604235 27.09.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CZ288919 12.09.2001B6
CZ168597 17.09.1997A3
Priority number Date
DE29515703 02.10.1995
EP9604235 27.09.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59604957D 18.05.2000D1
Priority number Date
DE59604957 27.09.1996
DE29515703 02.10.1995
EP9604235 27.09.1996
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5918717 06.07.1999A
Priority number Date
EP9604235 27.09.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9712786Global Dossier 10.04.1997A1
Priority number Date
DE29515703 02.10.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1087241C 10.07.2002C
CN1166157 26.11.1997A
Priority number Date
DE29515703 02.10.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE29515703U 08.02.1996U1
Priority number Date
DE29515703 02.10.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2146021T 16.07.2000T3
Priority number Date
DE29515703 02.10.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ZA9608277 02.05.1997B
Priority number Date
DE29515703 02.10.1995