Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0793588

EP0793588 - ROTARY DRIVE FOR A BELT RETRACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FÖHL, Artur
Auf der Halde 28
73614 Schorndorf / DE
[1997/37]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1997/37]
Representative(s)Degwert, Hartmut , et al
Prinz & Partner
Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/37]Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Prinz & Partner Manzingerweg 7
81241 München / DE
Application number, filing date96933416.827.09.1996
[1997/37]
WO1996EP04235
Priority number, dateDE1995215703U02.10.1995         Original published format: DE 29515703 U
[1997/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9712786
Date:10.04.1997
Language:DE
[1997/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0793588
Date:10.09.1997
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.1997
[1997/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0793588
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:B60R22/46
[1997/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1997/37]
TitleGerman:DREHANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN GURTSTRAFFER[1997/37]
English:ROTARY DRIVE FOR A BELT RETRACTOR[1997/37]
French:MECANISME ROTATIF D'ENTRAINEMENT POUR UN RETRACTEUR DE CEINTURE DE SECURITE[1997/37]
Entry into regional phase02.07.1997National basic fee paid 
02.07.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/37]
16.06.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.07.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.12.1999Fee for grant paid
08.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
02.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE2535380  (BAYERN-CHEMIE GESELLSCHAFT FÜR FLUGCHEMISCHE ANTRIEBE M.B.H.) [Y] 1-4,7 * the whole document *;
 [YA]DE29500807U  (FÖHL, ARTUR) [Y] 1-4,7 * page 4, line 30 - page 6, line 7; figures 1,2 * * page 7, paragraph 2 * [A] 5,6,8;
 [A]EP0152395  (HUBLET, JEAN-MARIE) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [PY]DE4421758  (FÖHL, ARTUR) [PY] 1,9 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 20; figures 1,2 * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 14; figures 9A-12 *;
 [YA]DE29506208U  (HS TECHNIK UND DESIGN TECHNISCHE ENTWICKLUNGEN GMBH) [Y] 1,9 * page 9, line 6 - page 12, line 19; figures 1-4 * [A] 2-6;
 [A]EP0648652  (HS TECHNIK UND DESIGN TECHNISCHE ENTWICKLUNGEN GMBH) [A] 1 * column 5, line 18 - column 6, line 21; figure 8; claims 1,8,9,11,13,17 *;
 [A]DE9415157U  (FÖHL, ARTUR) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2713769  (J. JOHNSON) [A] 1 * column 2, line 12 - column 4, line 71; figure - *