Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0865495

EP0865495 - PROGESTIN-REGULATED GENE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.07.2005
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.09.2005  [2005/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Garvan Institute of Medical Research
St. Vincent's Hospital
384 Victoria Street
Darlinghurst, NSW 2010 / AU
[N/P]
Former [1998/39]For all designated states
GARVAN INSTITUTE OF MEDICAL RESEARCH
St. Vincent's Hospital, 384 Victoria Street
Darlinghurst, NSW 2010 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / WATTS, Colin, Kenneth, William
167 Avalon Parade
Avalon, NSW 2107 / AU
02 / HAMILTON, Jenny, Ann
251 Nelson Road
Mount Nelson, TAS 7007 / AU
[1998/39]
Representative(s)Harding, Charles Thomas
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/39]Harding, Charles Thomas
D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date96934194.024.10.1996
[1998/39]
WO1996AU00669
Priority number, dateAU1995PN0614424.10.1995         Original published format: AU PN614495
AU1996PO0112819.07.1996         Original published format: AU PO112896
[1998/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9715674
Date:01.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0865495
Date:23.09.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.1997
[1998/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU01.05.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/55, C12N15/54, C12N9/12, C12N9/16, C07K16/40
[1998/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/39]
TitleGerman:PROGESTIN-REGULIERTES GEN[1998/39]
English:PROGESTIN-REGULATED GENE[1998/39]
French:GENE REGULE PAR DE LA PROGESTINE[1998/39]
Entry into regional phase20.05.1998National basic fee paid 
20.05.1998Search fee paid 
20.05.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
20.05.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.05.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
20.05.1998Examination requested  [1998/39]
06.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/37]
12.04.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[PX]  - SAKAI ET AL., "Cloning of cDNA encoding for a novel isoenzyme of fructose-6-phosphate,2-kinase/fructose-2,6-biphosphatase from human placenta", JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 119, pages 506 - 511, XP000980141 [PX] 1,2,6,7,11-14 * the whole document *
International search[A]  - VENTURA F, ET AL., "CLONING AND EXPRESSION OF A CATALYTIC CORE BOVINE BRAIN 6-PHOSPHOFRUCTO-2-KINSE/FRUCTOSE-2,6-BISPHOSPATASE", Biochemical and Biophysical Research Communications, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, US, (19950426), vol. 209, no. 03, doi:10.1006/bbrc.1995.1616, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 1140 - 1149, XP002941300

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1995.1616