Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0871472

EP0871472 - CYTOKINES AND THEIR USE IN TREATMENT AND/OR PROPHYLAXIS OF BREAST CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.01.2006
Database last updated on 18.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.01.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.02.2006  [2006/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE WALTER AND ELIZA HALL INSTITUTE OF MEDICAL RESEARCH
1G Royal Parade
Parkville, VIC 3050 / AU
[N/P]
Former [2004/52]For all designated states
The Walter and Eliza Hall Institute of Medical Research
1G Royal Parade
Parkville, VIC 3050 / AU
Former [1998/43]For all designated states
Amrad Operations Pty., Ltd.
17-27 Cotham Road
Kew, VIC 3101 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / DOUGLAS, Andrea, Margaret
45 Catherine Road
East Bentleigh, VIC 3165 / AU
02 / BEGLEY, Colin, Glenn
3 Era Court
Donvale, VIC 3111 / AU
[1998/43]
Representative(s)Jones, Elizabeth Louise , et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/43]Jones, Elizabeth Louise , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date96934201.325.10.1996
[1998/43]
WO1996AU00676
Priority number, dateAU1995PN0624227.10.1995         Original published format: AU PN624295
AU1995PN0624327.10.1995         Original published format: AU PN624395
AU1996PN0896627.03.1996         Original published format: AU PN896696
AU1996PN0036407.06.1996         Original published format: AU PN036496
[1998/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9716202
Date:09.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0871472
Date:21.10.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.1997
[1998/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU09.05.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/19, A61K38/20, A61K38/18, A61P35/00
[2001/22]
Former International [1998/43]A61K38/19, A61K38/20
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/43]
Extension statesAL27.05.1998
LT27.05.1998
LV27.05.1998
RO27.05.1998
SI27.05.1998
TitleGerman:CYTOKINE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG IN BEHANDLUNG UND/ODER VORBEUGUNG VON BRUSTKREBS[1998/43]
English:CYTOKINES AND THEIR USE IN TREATMENT AND/OR PROPHYLAXIS OF BREAST CANCER[1998/43]
French:CYTOKINES ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT ET/OU LA PROPHYLAXIE DU CANCER DU SEIN[1998/43]
Entry into regional phase27.05.1998National basic fee paid 
27.05.1998Search fee paid 
27.05.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
27.05.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.04.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
27.05.1998Examination requested  [1998/43]
11.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
27.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2004Request for decision received: Request for further processing
13.05.2004Result of request for decision (Request for further processing): Request granted
09.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.08.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/08]
23.09.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/08]
Request for further processing for:27.02.2004Request for further processing filed
27.02.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.05.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
21.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
18.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
16.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.11.199803   M06   Fee paid on   23.11.1998
31.10.200207   M06   Fee paid on   16.04.2003
31.10.200510   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4863902  (AMAGASE HARUNOBU [JP], et al) [X] 8-11,15 * column 5, line 15 - column 6, line 60 * * column 9, line 11 - line 53 * * column 20, line 1 - column 21, line 32 * * claims 1-45 *;
 [X]EP0326120  (YEDA RES & DEV [IL]) [X] 1-7,12-14,16 * page 2, line 15 - line 17 * * page 2, line 44 - line 45 * * page 4, line 21 - line 25 * * example 6 * * page 14, line 1 - line 16 * * claims 17,20 *;
 [X]WO9509005  (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [X] 1-10,12-16 * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 23 * * page 10, line 27 - line 32 * * page 12, line 17 - line 24 * * page 15, line 1 - page 16, line 16 * * claims 1-4,8-10,22 *;
 [X]  MURAYAMA Y ET AL, "EPIDERMAL GROWTH FACTOR SUPPRESSES THE TUMOR GROWTH OF HUMAN BREAST CANCER TRANSPLANTED IN NUDE MICE", CANCER DETECTION AND PREVENTION, (1991), vol. 15, no. 2, ISSN 0361-090X, pages 161 - 164, XP000990981 [X] 1,2,5-7,12-14,16 * the whole document *
 [A]  LIU J ET AL, "Oncostatin M inhibits breast cancer cell growth.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH ANNUAL, Eighty-sixth Annual Meeting of the American Association for Cancer Research;Toronto, Ontario, Canada; March 18-22, 1995, 1995, (1995), vol. 36, ISSN 0197-016X, page 256, XP000990973 [A] 1-3,5-7,12-14,16 * the whole document *
International search[X]US5428012  (SHOYAB MOHAMMED [US], et al);
 [X]AU3251693  (AMRAD CORP LTD);
 [XP]AU4187196  (ANGELETTI P IST RICHERCHE BIO [IT]);
 [X]US5216128  (NOVICK DANIELA [IL], et al);
 [X]  - CHEN L, SCHULMAN L M, REVEL M, "IL-6 RECEPTORS AND SENSITIVITY TO GROWTH INHIBITION BY IL-6 IN CLONES OF HUMAN BREAST CARCINOMA CELLS", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL REGULATORS AND HOMEOSTATIC AGENTS., WICHTIG EDITORE, MILAN., IT, IT, (19910101), vol. 05, no. 04, ISSN 0393-974X, pages 125 - 136, XP002945198
 [X]  - NICOLA N.A. Ed., "Guidebook to Cytokines and Their Receptors", 1994, SAMBROOK AND TOOZE PUBLICATION AT OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, pages 56-58, 86-88, 124-129, 194-197.,