EP0929467 - PACKAGING WRAPPER CLOSED BY TWISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/29] | PACKAGING WRAPPER SEALED WITH FOILS, AND PACKAGING METHOD | ||
[1999/40] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2003 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Transpac N.V. avenue Hermann-Debroux, 46 1160 Bruxelles / BE | [1999/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAELMANS, Eddy Sint-Jansweg 7 B-3650 Dilsen-Stokkem / BE | 02 /
VANOPPRE, Raymond Webbekomstraat 7 B-3290 Diest / BE | [1999/29] | Representative(s) | Meyers, Ernest, et al pronovem - MEYERS & VAN MALDEREN 261 route d'Arlon 8011 Strassen / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | Meyers, Ernest, et al Office de Brevets Meyers & Van Malderen 261 route d'Arlon B.P. 111 8002 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 96934592.5 | 08.10.1996 | [1999/29] | WO1996EP04378 | Priority number, date | BE19950001085 | 29.12.1995 Original published format: BE 9501085 | [1999/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9724273 | Date: | 10.07.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0929467 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0929467 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/10] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0929467 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/10 | [1999/29] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/29] | Extension states | LT | 10.11.1997 | LV | 10.11.1997 | SI | 10.11.1997 | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSUMSCHLAG, WELCHER DURCH VERDREHEN GESCHLOSSEN WIRD | [2002/47] | English: | PACKAGING WRAPPER CLOSED BY TWISTS | [2003/12] | French: | ENVELOPPE D'EMBALLAGE FERMEE PAR DES PAPILLOTES | [2002/47] |
Former [1999/29] | VERPACKUNGSUMSCHLAG, WELCHER DURCH VERDREHEN GESCHLOSSEN WIRD UND VERPACKUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [1999/29] | PACKAGING WRAPPER SEALED WITH FOILS, AND PACKAGING METHOD | ||
Former [1999/29] | ENVELOPPE D'EMBALLAGE FERMEE PAR DES PAPILLOTES ET PROCEDE D'EMBALLAGE | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.1997 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.11.1997 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 14.05.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 26.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.07.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 06.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.12.2000
ADMISSIBLE Pactec Verpackungsmaschinen-Fabrik Theegarten GmbH & Co. KG Breitscheidstr. 46 01237 Dresden / DE Opponent's representative Klitzsch, Gottfried Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.12.2000
ADMISSIBLE Pactec Verpackungsmaschinen-Fabrik Theegarten GmbH & Co. KG Breitscheidstr. 46 01237 Dresden / DE Opponent's representative Klitzsch, Gottfried Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | 15.01.2001 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.07.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.07.2001 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2001 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 20.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 08.10.2002 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.10.2002 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 31.03.2003 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]GB1096058 (WILLIAM ROBERT BROWN) [DA] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]US4663219 (JANOCHA SIEGFRIED [DE], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 2, line 8 - line 51 *; | [A]DE9111671U (EBERT FOLIEN AG) | Opposition | DE7407253U | CH225279 | GB666501 | BE1009877 | EP0816229 |