Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0856074

EP0856074 - THREAD FEED DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MEMMINGER-IRO GMBH
Jakob-Mutz-Strasse 7
72277 Dornstetten / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/32]For all designated states
MEMMINGER-IRO GmbH
Jakob-Mutz-Strasse 7
72277 Dornstetten / DE
Inventor(s)01 / OHLSON, Per
Ringvägen 8
S-523 94 Tvärred / SE
02 / JACOBSSON, Kurt, Arne, Gunnar
Stenasgatan 11
S-523 33 Ulricehamn / SE
[1998/32]
Representative(s)Kinkeldey, Hermann , et al
Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/32]Kinkeldey, Hermann, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date96934622.010.10.1996
[1998/32]
WO1996EP04409
Priority number, dateDE199513844916.10.1995         Original published format: DE 19538449
[1998/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9714836
Date:24.04.1997
Language:DE
[1997/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0856074
Date:05.08.1998
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.1997
[1998/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0856074
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:D04B15/48
[1998/32]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT,   NL,   SE [1998/32]
TitleGerman:FADENLIEFERGERÄT[1998/32]
English:THREAD FEED DEVICE[1998/32]
French:DISPOSITIF DE LIVRAISON DU FIL[1998/32]
Entry into regional phase27.03.1998National basic fee paid 
27.03.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.04.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/32]
13.11.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.03.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.07.1999Fee for grant paid
07.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[DA]US3642219  (ROSEN KARL ISAC JOEL);
 [A]DE2725185  (IRO AB)