Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0855954

EP0855954 - EXTRUDER FOR PLASTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gefinex Jackon GMBH
Rote Erde 6
33803 Steinhagen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/32]For all designated states
Gefinex-Jackon GMBH
Rote Erde 6
33803 Steinhagen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KOLOSSOW, Klaus, Dieter
Waldweg 4
D-29313 Hambühren / DE
[1998/32]
Representative(s)Kaewert, Klaus
Rechtsanwalt Gänsestrasse 4
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/32]Kaewert, Klaus
Rechtanwalt, Gänsestrasse 4
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date96934764.021.10.1996
[1998/32]
WO1996EP04556
Priority number, dateDE199513920321.10.1995         Original published format: DE 19539203
[1998/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9715433
Date:01.05.1997
Language:DE
[1997/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0855954
Date:05.08.1998
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.1997
[1998/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0855954
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.05.1997
ClassificationInternational:B29C47/42, B29C47/50, B29C47/74
[1998/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/32]
TitleGerman:EXTRUDER FÜR KUNSTSTOFFE[1998/32]
English:EXTRUDER FOR PLASTICS[1998/32]
French:EXTRUDEUSE POUR MATIERES PLASTIQUES[1998/32]
Entry into regional phase23.02.1998National basic fee paid 
23.02.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
23.02.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.02.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/32]
13.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.1999Fee for grant paid
03.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.11.199904   M06   Fee paid on   13.11.1999
Cited inInternational search[YA]EP0244591  (BERSTORFF GMBH MASCH HERMANN [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * column A * * column 3, line 1 - line 45 * * figure -; claim 1 * [A] 10,16-18,32,35-37,40,41,55;
 [YA]DE4231232  (HERMANN BERSTORFF MASCHINENBAU GMBH) [Y] 1-6 * column A * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 33 * * column 4, line 41 - line 51 * * figure 1; claims 2-5,7,8 * [A] 7-9,13-15,17-20,28,29,33,34,42-49,55;
 [A]DE2905717  (BERSTORFF GMBH MASCH HERMANN) [A] 1-8,15,24-29,34-37,41-45,48-52 * claim - * * page 4, line 12 - line 32 * * page 5, line 4 - page 7, line 19 * * figure . *;
 [A]GB2085352  (BERSTORFF GMBH MASCH HERMANN) [A] 1,10,11,17,18,32 * page 2, line 11 - line 20 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]FR2496002  (COMIND SPA [IT]) [A] 38,39 * page 1, line 4 - line 6 * * page 3, line 32 - page 4, line 27 * * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]GB2148781  (BERSTORFF GMBH MASCH HERMANN) [A] 11,12 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]GB1219946  (ICI LTD [GB]) [A] 30,31 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US3868093  (SOKOLOW NICKOLAS N) [A] 31,53,54 * column A * * figures 1,2,4 * * column 2, line 15 - line 29 * * column 3, line 7 - line 37 * * claims 1-3 *;
 [A]GB864916  (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO) [A] 21-23