Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0797718

EP0797718 - TEMPORARY DOOR STOP FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR HINGE, AND DEVICE FOR ATTACHING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.03.2001 [2001/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ARIES INDUSTRIES MECANISMES ET DECOUPAGE FIN
ZA de Courtaboeuf, 3,avenue du Canada
91940 Les Ulis / FR
[2000/15]
Former [1997/40]For all designated states
E.P.I., Européenne de Participations Industrielle, Société Anonyme
12 bis, rue Soyer
92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR
Inventor(s)01 / PARIZEL, Francis
22, avenue de la Gare
F-91570 Bièvres / FR
[1997/40]
Representative(s)Lanceplaine, Jean-Claude , et al
Cabinet Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1997/40]Lanceplaine, Jean-Claude , et al
CABINET LAVOIX 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date96934926.516.10.1996
[1997/40]
WO1996FR01622
Priority number, dateFR1995001212917.10.1995         Original published format: FR 9512129
FR1996000858610.07.1996         Original published format: FR 9608586
[1997/40]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9714864
Date:24.04.1997
Language:FR
[1997/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0797718
Date:01.10.1997
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.1997
[1997/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0797718
Date:05.04.2000
Language:FR
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:E05C17/04, E05D11/10, E05D5/12
[1997/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR [1997/40]
TitleGerman:PROVISORISCHER TÜRANSCHLAG FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUGSCHARNIER UND VORRICHTUNG UM DIESEN ANZUBRINGEN[1999/31]
English:TEMPORARY DOOR STOP FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR HINGE, AND DEVICE FOR ATTACHING SAME[1997/40]
French:ARRET DE PORTE PROVISOIRE POUR CHARNIERE D'UNE PORTE DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE ET DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION D'UN TEL ARRET DE PORTE PROVISOIRE[1997/40]
Former [1997/40]PROVISORISCHER TÜRANSCHLAG FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUGSCHARNFIER UND VORRICHTUNG UM DIESEN ANZUBRINGEN
Entry into regional phase07.07.1997National basic fee paid 
07.07.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/40]
01.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.1999Fee for grant paid
20.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]FR1091949  (BERNEUX ET.AL.) [Y] 1,2,4,6 * page 1, column L, paragraph 5 - page 2, column L, line 14; figure - *;
 [Y]US4774740  (GIDSEG EDWARD D [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,6 * column 4, line 35 - column 10, line 60; figure - *;
 [A]US5054165  (MARCHIONE JOSEPH H [US]) [A] 1,4-8 * column 2, line 44 - column 7, line 2; figure - *;
 [A]DE362608  (PAUL HELBIG) [A] 1,4,5 * page 1, line 1 - line 55; figure 1 *;
 [A]US3854167  (FUKUMOTO R, et al) [A] 1,5-8 * column 1, line 58 - column 6, line 20; figure - *;
 [A]DE4005457  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,10,11 * column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, line 21; figure - *;
 [A]FR2690390  (MGI COUTIER MUREAUX [FR]) [A] 1,10,11 * page 3, line 13 - page 6, line 29; figure - *;
 [A]DE8430030U  (LUNKE & SOHN GMBH) [A] 9,12-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0299147  (SCHARWAECHTER GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 9,12-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4012420  (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [A] 9,12-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0420685  (BLOXWICH ENG [GB]) [A] 14 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0341371  (SCHARWAECHTER GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3710417  (BERMAN D, et al) [A] 9 * the whole document *