Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0859876

EP0859876 - TIN PLATING ELECTROLYTE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MACDERMID INCORPORATED
245 Freight Street Waterbury
Connecticut 06702 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/48]For all designated states
MACDERMID INCORPORATED
245 Freight Street
Waterbury, Connecticut 06702 / US
Former [1998/35]For all designated states
YORKSHIRE CHEMICALS PLC.
Kirkstall Road
Leeds LS3 1LL / GB
Inventor(s)01 / O'DRISCOLL, Cavan, Hugh
61 East View, Barlby Road
Selby, North Yorkshire YO8 7BA / GB
[1998/35]
Representative(s)WP Thompson
8th Floor
1 Mann Island
Liverpool L3 1BP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]W.P. Thompson & Co.
Coopers Building Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Former [1999/48]W.P. THOMPSON & CO.
Coopers Building, Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Former [1998/35]McCall, John Douglas
W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Application number, filing date96935001.615.10.1996
[1998/35]
WO1996GB02524
Priority number, dateGB1995002119117.10.1995         Original published format: GB 9521191
GB1995002267306.11.1995         Original published format: GB 9522673
[1998/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9714827
Date:24.04.1997
Language:EN
[1997/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0859876
Date:26.08.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.1997
[1998/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0859876
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:C25D3/32
[1998/35]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   PT [1998/35]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROLYTZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR ZINNBESCHICHTUNG[1998/49]
English:TIN PLATING ELECTROLYTE COMPOSITIONS[1998/35]
French:COMPOSITIONS D'ELECTROLYTES D'ETAMAGE[1998/35]
Former [1998/35]ELEKTROLYTZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR LUMPLATTIERUNG
Entry into regional phase27.03.1998National basic fee paid 
27.03.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.03.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/35]
17.12.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.03.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.06.1999Fee for grant paid
23.06.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE05.01.2000
NL05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
[2003/09]
Former [2001/09]BE05.01.2000
PT05.04.2000
Former [2001/08]BE05.01.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]FR2534279  (OBATA KEIGO [JP]) [A] * page 9, line 15 - line 20 *