Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0859699

EP0859699 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURING LABELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.12.2001
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 05.01.2005  [2005/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wilkey, Andrew William
Boverton Park House, Boverton Llantwit Major
South Glamorgan CF61 1UH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/35]For all designated states
Wilkey, Andrew William
Boverton Park House, Boverton
Llantwit Major, South Glamorgan CF61 1UH / GB
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/35]
Representative(s)Gibson, Stewart Harry
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff
CF10 2HH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/35]Gibson, Stewart Harry
URQUHART-DYKES & LORD, Three Trinity Court, 21-27 Newport Road
Cardiff CF2 1AA / GB
Application number, filing date96935189.907.11.1996
[1998/35]
WO1996GB02731
Priority number, dateGB1995002286308.11.1995         Original published format: GB 9522863
GB1996001224412.06.1996         Original published format: GB 9612244
[1998/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9717194
Date:15.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0859699
Date:26.08.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.1997
[1998/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0859699
Date:07.02.2001
Language:EN
[2001/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.05.1997
ClassificationInternational:B31D1/02
[1998/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/35]
Extension statesAL08.06.1998
LT08.06.1998
LV08.06.1998
RO08.06.1998
SI08.06.1998
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ETIKETTEN[1998/35]
English:METHOD OF MANUFACTURING LABELS[1998/35]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'ETIQUETTES[1998/35]
Entry into regional phase08.06.1998National basic fee paid 
08.06.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
08.06.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.06.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/35]
04.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.04.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.01.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.06.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
26.07.2000Fee for grant paid
26.07.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.11.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2002/05]
Request for further processing for:17.07.2000Request for further processing filed
26.07.2000Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.08.2000Decision despatched
21.04.1999Request for further processing filed
20.04.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
07.05.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.02.2001
CH07.02.2001
FI07.02.2001
LI07.02.2001
NL07.02.2001
SE07.02.2001
DK07.05.2001
PT07.05.2001
GR11.05.2001
IE07.11.2001
LU07.11.2001
MC07.11.2001
[2005/01]
Former [2004/42]AT07.02.2001
CH07.02.2001
FI07.02.2001
LI07.02.2001
NL07.02.2001
SE07.02.2001
DK07.05.2001
PT07.05.2001
IE07.11.2001
LU07.11.2001
MC07.11.2001
Former [2004/39]AT07.02.2001
CH07.02.2001
FI07.02.2001
LI07.02.2001
NL07.02.2001
SE07.02.2001
DK07.05.2001
PT07.05.2001
LU07.11.2001
MC07.11.2001
Former [2003/46]AT07.02.2001
CH07.02.2001
FI07.02.2001
LI07.02.2001
NL07.02.2001
SE07.02.2001
DK07.05.2001
PT07.05.2001
MC07.11.2001
Former [2003/31]AT07.02.2001
CH07.02.2001
FI07.02.2001
LI07.02.2001
NL07.02.2001
SE07.02.2001
PT07.05.2001
MC07.11.2001
Former [2003/09]AT07.02.2001
CH07.02.2001
FI07.02.2001
LI07.02.2001
NL07.02.2001
PT07.05.2001
MC07.11.2001
Former [2002/43]AT07.02.2001
CH07.02.2001
FI07.02.2001
LI07.02.2001
PT07.05.2001
MC07.11.2001
Former [2002/27]AT07.02.2001
CH07.02.2001
FI07.02.2001
LI07.02.2001
PT07.05.2001
Former [2002/13]AT07.02.2001
CH07.02.2001
FI07.02.2001
LI07.02.2001
Former [2002/12]AT07.02.2001
FI07.02.2001
Former [2002/10]AT07.02.2001
Cited inInternational search[A]US4273606  (TRILLI PASQUALE) [A] 1,29;
 [A]GB2239855  (OSAKA SEALING LABEL PRINT [JP]) [A] 1,29;
 [A]GB2198701  (NORPRINT INT LTD) [A] 1,29;
 [A]WO9322116  (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US]) [A] 1,29
by applicantGB2198701