Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0876818

EP0876818 - AGENT FOR TREATING NEURO-DEGENERATIVE DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.12.2003  [2003/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Selena Pharmaceuticals, Inc
167 Skyview Way San Francisco
California 94131 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/49]For all designated states
Selena Pharmaceuticals, Inc
167 Skyview Way
San Francisco, California 94131 / US
Former [1998/46]For all designated states
Zefirov, Nikolai Serafimovich
ul. Tsentralnaya, 22-179, Noginsky r-on, pos Chernogolovka
Moskovskaya obl., 142432 / RU
For all designated states
Afanasiev, Andrei Zakharovich
pr. Stroitelei, 2-103, Noginsky r-on, pos. Chernogolovka
Moskovskaya obl., 142432 / RU
For all designated states
Afanasieva, Svetlana Vasilievna
pr. Stroitelei, 2-103, Noginsky r-on, pos Chernogolovka
Moskovskaya obl., 142432 / RU
For all designated states
Bachurin, Sergei Olegovich
ul. Tsentralnaya, 4b-47, Noginsky r-on, pos. Chernogolovka
Moskovskaya obl., 142432 / RU
For all designated states
Tkachenko, Sergei Evgenievich
ul. Tsentralnaya, 4-41, Noginsky r-on, pos. Chernogolovka
Moskovskaya obl., 142432 / RU
For all designated states
Grigoriev, Vladimir Viktorovich
Institutsky pr., 13-60, Noginsky r-on, pos. Chernogolovka
Moskovskaya obl., 142432 / RU
For all designated states
Jurovskaya, Marina Abramovna
Sumskoi pr., 21-4
Moscow, 113208 / RU
For all designated states
Chetverikov, Valery Pavlovich
ul. Narodnaya, 7-35, Novokuznetsk
Kemerovskaya obl., 654001 / RU
For all designated states
Bukatina, Elizaveta Evgenievna
Zemlyanoi val, 21/2-68
Moscow, 103064 / RU
For all designated states
Grigorieva, Irina Vladimirovna
ul. Kantemirovskaya, 20-2-560
Moscow, 115400 / RU
Inventor(s)01 / Zefirov, Nikolai Serafimovich
pr.,99,kv.553, Leninsky
Moscow, 117421 / RU
02 / Afanasiev, Andrei Zakharovich
pr. Stroitelei 2,kv.103, Noginsky r-on
Chernogolovka Moskovskaya oblast, 142432 / RU
03 / Afanasieva, Svetlana Vasilievna
pr. Strootelei 2, kv.103, Noginsky r-on
Chernogolovka Moskovskaya oblast, 142432 / RU
04 / Bachurin, Sergei Olegovich
ul. Tsentralnaya, 4b,kv.47, Noginsky r-on
Chernogolovka Moskovskaya oblast, 142432 / RU
05 / Tkachenko, Sergei Evgenievich
ul. Tsentralnaya, 4,kv.41, Noginsky r-on
Chernogolovka Moskovskaya oblast, 142432 / RU
06 / Grigoriev, Vladimir Viktorovich
Shkolny bul.,19,kv.94, Noginskyr-on
Chernogolovka Moskovskaya oblast, 142432 / RU
07 / Jurovskaya, Marina Abramovna
Sumskoi pr., 21,korpus 4,kv.72
Moscow, 113208 / RU
08 / Chetverikov, Valery Pavlovich
ul. Narodnaya,7,kv.35, Novokuznetsk
Kemerovskaya oblast, 654001 / RU
09 / Bukatina, Elizaveta Evgenievna
Zemlyanoy val, 21/2, kv.68
Moscow, 103064 / RU
10 / Grigorieva, Irina Vladimirovna
ul. Kantemirovskaya, 20/2,kv.560
Moscow, 115400 / RU
 [2003/03]
Former [1998/46]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Harris, Ian Richard , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/46]Harris, Ian Richard , et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date96935637.723.10.1996
[1998/46]
WO1996RU00306
Priority number, dateRU1995011825223.10.1995         Original published format: RU 95118252
[1998/46]
Filing languageRU
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9715225
Date:01.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/19]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0876818
Date:11.11.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.1997
[1998/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0876818
Date:18.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU17.02.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/475, A61P25/28
[2001/46]
Former International [1998/52]A61K31/475, A61K31/535
Former International [1998/46]A61K31/475
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/46]
Extension statesLT25.05.1998
LV25.05.1998
RO25.05.1998
SI25.05.1998
TitleGerman:WIRKSTOFF ZUR BEHANDLUNG NEURODEGENERATIVER STÖRUNGEN[1998/46]
English:AGENT FOR TREATING NEURO-DEGENERATIVE DISORDERS[1998/46]
French:AGENT THERAPEUTIQUE CONTRE LES TROUBLES NEURODEGENERATIFS[1998/46]
Entry into regional phase29.05.1998Translation filed 
25.05.1998National basic fee paid 
25.05.1998Search fee paid 
25.05.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
25.05.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.05.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: RU
25.05.1998Examination requested  [1998/46]
21.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
09.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
03.07.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
16.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.09.2002Fee for grant paid
17.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
04.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
03.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
02.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.11.200005   M06   Fee paid on   03.11.2000
01.11.200106   M06   Fee paid on   02.11.2001
Documents cited:Search[X]  - STOLC ET AL, "protective effect of stobadine, a pyridoindole antioxidant, in hypoxia-reoxygenation injury of ganglionic and hippocampal neurotransmission", MOL CHEM NEUROPATH., (199506), vol. 25, no. 2-3, pages f199 - 212, XP002082936 [X] 1 * page 201, line 2; figure 1 * * page 210, line 7 - line 19 *
 [X]  - BENES, "free radicals and ischemic states", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1986), vol. 105, no. 22, Database accession no. 197735, XP002082937 [X] 1 * abstract *
    [] - BENES, "free radicals and ischemic states", CESK FARM, (1986), vol. 35, no. 5, pages 230 - 232,
International search[A]SU592359  (ENDO LAB [US]);
 [A]SU665804  (ENDO LAB [US]);
 [A]SU1138164  (SHADURSKIJ KONSTANTIN S, et al);
 [A]SU873883  (PFIZER [US]);
 [A]SU1442074  (AMERICAN HOME PROD [US]);
 [A]SU1816451  ;
 [A]WO9406428  (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US]);
 [A]WO9320820  (SCHERING AG [DE])