Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP0855924

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 CH 
 DE 
 DK 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 IE 
 IT 
 LI 
 NL 
 SE 
Examination procedure29.04.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase18.05.1998National basic fee paid 
18.05.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
18.05.1998Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
European patent granted28.07.1999
Opposition procedure02.07.2005Legal effect of rejection of opposition published on 31.08.2005 
Appeal following opposition04.06.2002APPEAL FILED
08.07.2002APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
01.07.2005APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:05.08.1998 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE
 
Event date:05.08.1998 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19980518
 
Event date:04.11.1998 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19980918
 
Event date:28.07.1999 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE
 
Event date:28.07.1999 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:182475
Country of Ref Document:AT
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:19990815
Kind Code of Ref Document:T
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:30.07.1999 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:02.09.1999 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69603498
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:19990902
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:06.10.1999 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:08.10.1999 
Event description:IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED
 
Event date:29.10.1999 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
REPRESENTATIVE:DIPL.-ING. ETH H. R. WERFFELI PATENTANWALT
 
Event date:26.11.1999 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:16.12.1999 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2137730 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:06.03.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:28.06.2000 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
OPPONENT:SIEMENS-ELEMA AB
Effective DATE:20000426
 
Event date:01.09.2000 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
OPPONENT:SIEMENS-ELEMA AB
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:07.09.2005 
Event description:OPPOSITION REJECTED
Effective DATE:20050702
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20131018
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20131028
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20131017
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20131022
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:28.02.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20131021
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:28.02.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20131018
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:02.06.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE EUG
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT HAS LAPSED
 
Event date:20.05.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL V1
Code Expl.:-LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20150501
 
Event date:15.06.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MM01 182475 AT T
Code Expl.:-LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES
Effective DATE:20141010
 
Event date:30.06.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20141031
 
Event date:31.07.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20141010
 
Event date:31.07.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20141011
 
Event date:29.07.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MM4A
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:31.08.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20141010
 
Event date:31.08.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150501
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20141010
 
Event date:02.11.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.12.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20151023
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.01.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20151027
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.01.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20151026
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.01.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20151019
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.01.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20151012
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.02.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20151015
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.02.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20151102
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:10.10.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69603498 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:17.10.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK EUP
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT EXPIRED
Effective DATE:20161010
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:02.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20161009
 
Event date:26.01.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20170126
 
Event date:31.01.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20161009
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20161011
 
Event date:05.10.2005 
Event description:APPEAL REFERENCE MODIFIED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCREFNO
 
Event date:12.07.2005 
Event description:APPEAL PROCEDURE CLOSED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA9O
 
Event date:10.01.2005 
Event description:APPEAL REFERENCE RECORDED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS REFN
 
Event date:13.07.2002 
Event description:APPEAL DOSSIER MODIFIED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS NOAPO
 
Event date:07.06.2002 
Event description:APPEAL DOSSIER MODIFIED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS NOAPO
 
Event date:11.06.1999 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:11.05.1999 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA
 
Event date:14.01.1999 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA
 
Event date:14.01.1999 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA
 
Event date:15.09.1998 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA
 
Event date:19.06.1998 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:22.07.2005 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: OPPOSITION REJECTED
 
Event date:22.07.2005 
Event description:OPPOSITION WITHDRAWN
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009264
 
Event date:22.07.2005 
Event description:OPPOSITION REJECTED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009273
 
Event date:05.04.2002 
Event description:OPPOSITION REJECTED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS REJO
 
Event date:05.10.2000 
Event description:REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OBSO
 
Event date:06.06.2000 
Event description:REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OBSO
 
Event date:12.05.2000 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260
 
Event date:04.05.2000 
Event description:UNPUBLISHED CHANGE TO OPPONENT DATA
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OPPO