Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0907428

EP0907428 - HOT STRIP REVERSING MILL WITH A SHAPEMETERING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TIPPINS INCORPORATED
P.O. Box 9547 435 Butler Street Pittsburgh
PA 15223-2126 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/15]For all designated states
TIPPINS INCORPORATED
P.O. Box 9547 435 Butler Street
Pittsburgh PA 15223-2126 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KAPLAN, Naum, M.
121 Drake Drive
Monroeville, PA 15146 / US
[1999/15]
Representative(s)Bartelds, Erik
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Bartelds, Erik
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
Former [1999/15]Bartelds, Erik
Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date96935998.319.09.1996
[1999/15]
WO1996US15476
Priority number, dateUS1996063972429.04.1996         Original published format: US 639724
[1999/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9740951
Date:06.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0907428
Date:14.04.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.1997
[1999/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.11.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B21B1/34, B21B37/28, B21B38/02
[2000/01]
Former International [1999/15]B21B1/34, B21B37/28
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/15]
TitleGerman:WARMBAND-REVERSIERWALZWERK MIT PLANHEITSMESSVORRICHTUNG[1999/15]
English:HOT STRIP REVERSING MILL WITH A SHAPEMETERING APPARATUS[1999/15]
French:LAMINOIR REVERSIBLE A BANDES A CHAUD EQUIPE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE MESURAGE DE FORMES[1999/15]
Entry into regional phase27.11.1998National basic fee paid 
27.11.1998Search fee paid 
27.11.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
27.11.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.12.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
27.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/15]
19.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
29.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/37]
04.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
09.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
26.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.10.199803   M06   Fee paid on   03.12.1998
01.10.199904   M06   Fee paid on   09.10.1999
30.09.200005   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2001
30.09.200106   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.2001
30.09.200207   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4782683  (TIPPPINS INC.) [Y] 1-5 * column 2, lines 6-8; figure 1 * * column 5, lines 56-59 *;
 [Y]GB1564389  (HOESCH WERKE AG) [Y] 1-5 * page 1, lines 44-52; claim 1 * * page 2, lines 31-49 *;
 [Y]US3331232  (KING) [Y] 2,10 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]GB2017974  (LOEWY ROBERTSON ENGINERING CO. LTD.) [Y] 10 * abstract *;
 [A]US4463586  (REYCAN RESEARCH LTD) [A] 5-9 * figure 1 *
International search[Y]US4580428  ;
 [Y]US3820365  ;
 [Y]US5285684  ;
 [A]US3292402  ;
 [A]US3331232  ;
 [A]US4497191