Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0853790

EP0853790 - METHOD OF STORING DATA IN A FLASH EEPROM MAIN MEMORY IN A COMPUTER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/30]FLASH EEPROM MAIN MEMORY IN A COMPUTER SYSTEM
[2005/23]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2006
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/30]For all designated states
INTEL CORPORATION
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HASBUN, Robert, N.
4544 Fawn Street
Shingle Springs, CA 95682 / US
02 / FAIZI, Asad
404 Canyon Terrace Lane
Folsom, CA 95630 / US
03 / LAM, Joann
2170 41st Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94116 / US
04 / RUSCITO, Peter, J.
182 Bayline Circle
Folsom, CA 95630 / US
[1998/30]
Representative(s)Wombwell, Francis , et al
Forresters
15, Hamilton Square
Birkenhead
Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/30]Wombwell, Francis , et al
Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square
Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB
Application number, filing date96936199.703.10.1996
[1998/30]
WO1996US15970
Priority number, dateUS1995053826103.10.1995         Original published format: US 538261
[1998/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9713204
Date:10.04.1997
Language:EN
[1997/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0853790
Date:22.07.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.1997
[1998/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0853790
Date:28.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.04.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06F12/06, G06F12/00, G06F12/08
[2000/27]
Former International [1998/30]G06F12/06, G06F12/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/30]
TitleGerman:vERFAHREN FÜR DAS EINSPEICHERN VON DATEN IN EINEM FLASH-EEPROM-HAUPTSPEICHER IN EINEM RECHNERSYSTEM[2005/23]
English:METHOD OF STORING DATA IN A FLASH EEPROM MAIN MEMORY IN A COMPUTER SYSTEM[2005/23]
French:METHODE D'ENREGISTREMENT DE DONNEES DANS UNE MEMOIRE EEPROM FLASH PRINCIPALE DANS UN SYSTEME ORDINATEUR[2005/23]
Former [1998/30]FLASH-EEPROM-HAUPTSPEICHER IN EINEM RECHNERSYSTEM
Former [1998/30]FLASH EEPROM MAIN MEMORY IN A COMPUTER SYSTEM
Former [1998/30]MEMOIRE EEPROM FLASH PRINCIPALE DANS UN SYSTEME ORDINATEUR
Entry into regional phase01.05.1998National basic fee paid 
01.05.1998Search fee paid 
01.05.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
01.05.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.04.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
01.05.1998Examination requested  [1998/30]
10.07.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
09.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.2005Fee for grant paid
04.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
20.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
22.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
23.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
25.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
27.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI28.12.2005
FR28.12.2005
IT28.12.2005
[2009/01]
Former [2008/06]FI28.12.2005
IT28.12.2005
Former [2006/24]FI28.12.2005
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5359569  (FUJITA KENJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9,12-21 * column 4, line 39 - line 53; figures 1,2 *
International search[Y]US5297148  (HARARI ELIYAHOU [US], et al);
 [YP]US5515333  (FUJITA KENJI [JP], et al);
 [A]US4369754  (LOFMAN BOB [US]);
 [AP]US5479638  (ASSAR MAHMUD [US], et al)