Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0870337

EP0870337 - FABRICATION OF THERMOELECTRIC MODULES AND SOLDER FOR SUCH FABRICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2003
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.11.2003  [2003/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Melcor Corporation
1040 Spruce Street
Trenton, NJ 08648 / US
[1998/42]
Inventor(s)01 / YAHATZ, Michael
161 Franklin Corner Road
Lawrenceville, NJ 0864 - H-6 / US
02 / HARPER, James
19 Empress Lane
Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US
[1998/42]
Representative(s)Knoblauch, Andreas , et al
Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch PartGmbB
Reuterweg 51-53
60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/43]Knoblauch, Andreas, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Schlosserstrasse 23
60322 Frankfurt / DE
Former [1998/42]Knoblauch, Ulrich, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch, Kühhornshofweg 10
60320 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date96936249.030.09.1996
[1998/42]
WO1996US16077
Priority number, dateUS1995053844903.10.1995         Original published format: US 538449
[2002/45]
Former [1998/42]US1995053844903.10.1995
US9616.09.1996
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9713283
Date:10.04.1997
Language:EN
[1997/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0870337
Date:14.10.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.1997
[1998/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0870337
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.04.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01L35/08, H01L35/10, H01L35/18
[1999/08]
Former International [1998/42]H01L35/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/42]
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNG THERMOELEKTRISCHER MODULE UND LÖTMITTEL FÜR DIESE HERSTELLUNG[1998/42]
English:FABRICATION OF THERMOELECTRIC MODULES AND SOLDER FOR SUCH FABRICATION[1998/42]
French:FABRICATION DE MODULES THERMOELECTRIQUES ET METAL D'APPORT DE BRASAGE POUR CETTE FABRICATION[1998/42]
Entry into regional phase28.04.1998National basic fee paid 
28.04.1998Search fee paid 
28.04.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
28.04.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.04.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.04.1998Examination requested  [1998/42]
08.07.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.12.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.11.2001Fee for grant paid
15.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.03.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority
11.04.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 02
Opposition(s)21.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
16.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
28.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
15.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
18.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]US4855810  (GELB ALLAN S [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US5429680  (FUSCHETTI DEAN F [US]) [A] 1,7 * figures 1,2; claims 1,4 *;
 [A]US3037064  (ROSI FRED D, et al)
 [A]  - IKUSHI YOSHIDA ET AL, "ANOMALOUS THERMOELECTRIC POWER OF BI/SB MULTILAYER FILMS AND RELATED TRANSPORT PHENOMENA", JOURNAL OF MAGNETISM AND MAGNETIC MATERIALS, (19930901), vol. 126, no. 1 - 03, pages 608 - 611, XP000395871 [A] 1 * page 608, column 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-8853(93)90701-3
International search[Y]US4489742  (MOORE DIANE E [US], et al);
 [Y]US4503131  (BAUDRAND DONALD W [US]);
 [Y]US3449173  (RUPPRECHT JOACHIM, et al);
 [A]US5429680  (FUSCHETTI DEAN F [US]);
 [A]US3859143  (KREBS THOMAS RICHARD);
 [A]US3110100  (HILL LAWRENCE R)
 [A]  - TERMOELEKTRICHESKIYE CKHLAZHDAYUSHCHIYE PRIBORY, 1967, YE A. KOLENKO, "Thermoelectric Cooling Devices", pages 131-138.,