Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0882120

EP0882120 - METAL FINISHING PROCESS AND COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.12.1999
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.1999Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.01.2000 [2000/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Singer, Barrie
502 Waverley Avenue
Clarks Summit, PA 18411 / US
[1998/50]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/50]
Representative(s)Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Am Riettor 5
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/50]Patentanwälte Westphal, Buchner, Mussgnug Neunert, Göhring
Waldstrasse 33
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Application number, filing date96936325.811.10.1996
[1998/50]
WO1996US16229
Priority number, dateUS1995054365116.10.1995         Original published format: US 543651
[1998/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9714778
Date:24.04.1997
Language:EN
[1997/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0882120
Date:09.12.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.1997
[1998/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.04.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/04, C11D3/20, C11D1/72, B08B3/08, C11D11/00
[1999/52]
Former International [1998/50]C11D3/04, C11D3/20, C11D1/72, B08B3/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/50]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON METALLOBERFLÄCHEN[1998/50]
English:METAL FINISHING PROCESS AND COMPOSITION[1998/50]
French:PROCEDE ET COMPOSITION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE DES METAUX[1998/50]
Entry into regional phase21.03.1998National basic fee paid 
21.03.1998Search fee paid 
21.03.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
21.03.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.05.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/50]
04.05.1999Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2000/03]
06.07.1999Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2000/03]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.199803   M06   Not yet paid
31.10.199904   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH04361265
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 04, Database accession no. 1993-032814, XP002122012 & JPH04361265 A 19921214 (KANSAI PAINT CO.) [A] 21 * abstract *
International search[Y]WO9428108  (ECOLAB INC [US]);
 [Y]US5035829  (SUWALA DAVID W [US]);
 [Y]US5421897  (GRAWE JOHN [US]);
 [Y]US4514325  (RUSSO ANTHONY [US], et al);
 [Y]US4242379  (HALL WILBUR S [US], et al)