Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0856124

EP0856124 - LAMP SYSTEM WITH CONDITIONED WATER COOLANT AND DIFFUSE REFLECTOR OF POLYTETRAFLUORETHYLENE (TPFE) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.04.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.05.2004  [2004/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
300 Lakeside Drive
22nd Floor
Oakland, California 94612-3550 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/32]For all designated states
THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA
300 Lakeside Drive, 22nd Floor
Oakland, California 94612-3550 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ZAPATA, Luis, E.
5486 Bianca Way
Livermore, CA 94550 / US
02 / HACKEL, Lloyd
1072 Sherry Way
Livermore, CA 94550 / US
[1998/32]
Representative(s)Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
Ladas & Parry LLP
Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/09]Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Former [1998/32]Baillie, Iain Cameron
Ladas & Parry, Altheimer Eck 2
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date96936400.911.10.1996
[1998/32]
WO1996US16341
Priority number, dateUS1995054602920.10.1995         Original published format: US 546029
[1998/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9714915
Date:24.04.1997
Language:EN
[1997/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0856124
Date:05.08.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.1997
[1998/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.04.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:F21V29/00, F21V7/22
[2000/08]
Former International [1998/32]F21V29/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/32]
TitleGerman:LAMPENSYSTEM MIT KONDITIONIERTEM WASSERKÜHLER UND DIFFUSER REFLEKTOR AUS POLYTETRAFLUORETHYLEN[1998/33]
English:LAMP SYSTEM WITH CONDITIONED WATER COOLANT AND DIFFUSE REFLECTOR OF POLYTETRAFLUORETHYLENE (TPFE)[1998/32]
French:SYSTEME DE LAMPE A REFROIDISSEUR PAR EAU CONDITIONNEE ET REFLECTEUR PAR DIFFUSION DE POLYTETRAFLUORETHYLENE (PTFE)[1998/32]
Former [1998/32]LAMPENSYSTEM MIT KÜHLUNG DURCH KONDITIONIERTES WASSER UND DIFFUSEM REFLEKTOR AUS POLYTETRAFLUORETHYLEN
Entry into regional phase19.05.1998National basic fee paid 
19.05.1998Search fee paid 
19.05.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
19.05.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.05.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.05.1998Examination requested  [1998/32]
03.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/21]
18.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
04.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
06.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
23.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200308   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]FR2311992  (SUN CHEMICAL CORP [US]);
 [Y]US5004541  (NOLL JOHN R [US], et al);
 [Y]SU184347
by applicantUS5446825
 US4755654
 US4820906
 US4630182
 US5446824
 US4461670