blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0862378 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0862378



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 88
15.02.2000 Confirmation of withdrawal of application/closure of proceedings Search / examination 1
18.01.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
18.01.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.01.2000 European search report Search / examination 3
07.12.1999 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
03.12.1999 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
31.08.1999 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
16.06.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.06.1999 Partial European search report Search / examination 4
08.12.1998 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
29.07.1998 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
19.05.1998 Annex Search / examination 3
19.05.1998 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
02.07.1997 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
01.05.1997 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 30
01.05.1997 Priority document Search / examination 28