blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0862378
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0862378Global Dossier 18.01.2000A4
EP0862378 09.09.1998A1
Priority number Date
US9616472 15.10.1996
US54859795 26.10.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU7431396 15.05.1997A
Priority number Date
US9616472 15.10.1996
US54859795 26.10.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2235601 01.05.1997A1
Priority number Date
US9616472 15.10.1996
US54859795 26.10.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9715228Global Dossier 01.05.1997A1
Priority number Date
US54859795 26.10.1995