Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0862378

EP0862378 - PRESSURE MEASUREMENT IN BLOOD TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.11.2002
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2002Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawnpublished on 08.01.2003  [2003/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medisystems Technology Corporation
Bank of America Plaza, Suite 1100, 300 South Fourth Street Las Vegas
Nevada 89101 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/37]For all designated states
Medisystems Technology Corporation
Bank of America Plaza, Suite 1100, 300 South Fourth Street
Las Vegas, Nevada 89101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / UTTERBERG, David, S.
2033 First Avenue 3
Seattle, WA 98121 / US
[1998/37]
Representative(s)Schubert, Siegmar
Patentanwälte
Dannenberg Schubert Gudel
Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39
60313 Frankfurt / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/37]Schubert, Siegmar, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Dr. Weinhold, Dannenberg, Dr. Gudel, Schubert Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39
60313 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date96936495.915.10.1996
[1998/37]
WO1996US16472
Priority number, dateUS1995054859726.10.1995         Original published format: US 548597
[1998/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9715228
Date:01.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0862378
Date:09.09.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.1997
[1998/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.05.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/00, A61M1/36
[1999/30]
Former International [1998/37]A61B5/00
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1998/37]
TitleGerman:DRUCKMESSUNG WÄHREND DAS BLUTBEHANDLUNG[1998/37]
English:PRESSURE MEASUREMENT IN BLOOD TREATMENT[1998/37]
French:MESURE DE LA PRESSION LORS DU TRAITEMENT DU SANG[1998/37]
Entry into regional phase19.05.1998National basic fee paid 
19.05.1998Search fee paid 
19.05.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
19.05.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.05.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.05.1998Examination requested  [1998/37]
04.05.1999Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/02]
31.08.1999Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/02]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.199803   M06   Not yet paid
31.10.199904   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4263808  (BELLOTTI MARC, et al) [X] 1,2,5,10 * column 1, line 6 - line 10 * * column 3, line 1 - line 19 * * column 3, line 35 - line 37 * * column 4, line 62 - line 68 * * column 5, line 16 - column 6, line 18 * * figures 1,4 *;
 [X]US3418853  (CURTIS GERALD R) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 47 - line 55 * * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 25 * * figure 3 *;
 [X]EP0240101  (GUEST WELDON S TRUSTEE [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 10, line 26 - line 38 * * column 11, line 15 - line 29 * * column 13, line 16 - line 23 * * column 16, line 7 - line 49 * * figures 1,4 *;
 [A]GB2208714  (COBE LAB [US]) [A] 1,2,10 * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 6 * * page 5, line 27 - page 6, line 2 * * page 6, line 14 - line 21 * * page 7, line 15 - line 27 * * figures 1,6 *;
 [A]US3908653  (KETTERING DONALD E) [A] 5 * column 2, line 13 - line 20 * * column 4, line 39 - line 64 * * figures 1,2 *
International search[Y]US5351686  (STEUER ROBERT R [US], et al);
 [Y]US4431009  (MARINO JR JOSEPH A [US], et al)