Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0927396

EP0927396 - MEMORY BUS TERMINATION MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.05.2001
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.06.2001 [2001/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Micron Technology, Inc.
8000 South Federal Way, P.O. Box 6
Boise, ID 83707-0006 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/27]For all designated states
Micron Technology, Inc.
8000 South Federal Way, P.O. Box 6
Boise, ID 83706-0006 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WALTHER, Terry, R.
2209 South Crosscreek
Boise, ID 83706 / US
[1999/27]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/27]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date96936677.217.10.1996
[1999/27]
WO1996US16708
Priority number, dateUS1995054403417.10.1995         Original published format: US 544034
[1999/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9715012
Date:24.04.1997
Language:EN
[1997/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0927396
Date:07.07.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.1997
[1999/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0927396
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/40
[1999/27]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [1999/27]
TitleGerman:SPEICHERBUSABSCHLUSSMODUL[1999/27]
English:MEMORY BUS TERMINATION MODULE[1999/27]
French:MODULE DE TERMINAISON DE BUS DE MEMOIRE[1999/34]
Former [1999/27]MODULE DE CONNEXION DE BUS DE MEMOIRE
Entry into regional phase06.05.1998National basic fee paid 
06.05.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
06.05.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.05.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.05.1998Examination requested  [1999/27]
19.05.1998Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
10.09.1998Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
12.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
21.12.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
17.01.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.04.2000Fee for grant paid
03.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
04.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
29.06.1998AT   M01   Not yet paid
29.06.1998BE   M01   Not yet paid
29.06.1998CH   M01   Not yet paid
29.06.1998DK   M01   Not yet paid
29.06.1998ES   M01   Not yet paid
29.06.1998FI   M01   Not yet paid
29.06.1998FR   M01   Not yet paid
29.06.1998GR   M01   Not yet paid
29.06.1998IE   M01   Not yet paid
29.06.1998IT   M01   Not yet paid
29.06.1998LU   M01   Not yet paid
29.06.1998MC   M01   Not yet paid
29.06.1998NL   M01   Not yet paid
29.06.1998PT   M01   Not yet paid
29.06.1998SE   M01   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9320519  (CTS CORP UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,2,5-8 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 2 *;
 [A]EP0571099  (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 9-13 * page 5, line 54 - page 6, line 9; figure 1 *
 [X]  - "Monolithic Terminating Resistor", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK US, (199004), vol. 32, no. 11, pages 326 - 327, XP000097726 [X] 1-13 * the whole document *
 [A]  - "Active Terminators for CMOS Drivers", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK US, (198909), vol. 32, no. 4a, pages 393 - 395, XP002024105 [A] 3,4 * page 393, paragraph 1 - page 394, paragraph 4; figures 1-4 *