EP0801574 - MODULATION OF INTEGRIN-MEDIATED SIGNAL TRANSDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLENNIUM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 40 Landsdowne Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states MILLENIUM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 620 Memorial Drive Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | ||
Former [1997/43] | For all designated states COR THERAPEUTICS, INC. 256 East Grand Avenue, Suite 80 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHILLIPS, David . San Mateo, CA / US | 02 /
LAW, Debbie A. . San Francisco, CA / US | 03 /
ALAIMO, Lisa N. 670 Belden Drive Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | [1998/07] |
Former [1997/43] | 01 /
PHILIPS, David . San Mateo, CA / US | ||
02 /
LAW, Debbie A. . San Francisco, CA / US | |||
03 /
ALAIMO, Lisa N. . Menlo Park, CA / US | Representative(s) | Orès, Bernard, et al Cabinet ORES 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/43] | Orès, Bernard, et al Cabinet ORES 6, Avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 96936741.6 | 18.10.1996 | [1997/43] | WO1996US16790 | Priority number, date | US19950005567P | 18.10.1995 Original published format: US 5567 P | [1997/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9714432 | Date: | 24.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0801574 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.04.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K39/38, A61K38/00, G01N33/53, G01N33/574, A01N37/18 | [1997/43] | CPC: |
C07K14/70546 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/43] | Title | German: | REGULIERUNG VON INTEGRIN VERMITTELTER SIGNALWEITERLEITUNG | [1997/43] | English: | MODULATION OF INTEGRIN-MEDIATED SIGNAL TRANSDUCTION | [1997/43] | French: | MODULATION DE LA TRANSDUCTION D'UN SIGNAL INDUIT PAR L'INTEGRINE | [1997/43] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.1997 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.1997 | Search fee paid | 01.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/43] | 04.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/45] | 07.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   22.03.2002 | 31.10.2003 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9525118 (TRUSTEES OF TUFTS UNIVERSITY [US]) [X] 1-13,27-29* pages 3 and 5; pages 43-44; pages 51-52 * | International search | [Y]US5192746 (LOBL THOMAS J [US], et al); | [Y]US5260277 (MCKENZIE THOMAS C [US]); | [YP]US5580979 (BACHOVCHIN WILLIAM W [US]) | [A] - JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, October 1990, Vol. 265, No. 30, LANZA, "Characterization of the Human Platelet Glycoprotein IIIa Gene. Comparison With the Fibronectin Receptor Beta-Subunit Gene", pages 18098-18103. | [X] - THE JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, 1994, Volume 126, Number 5, JOHANSSON, "Altered Localization and Cytoplasmic Domain-binding Properties of Tyrosine-phosphorylated B1 Integrin", pages 1299-1309. | [Y] - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGY CHEMISTRY, 15 July 1994, Vol. 269, No. 28, LUKASHEV, "Disruption of Integrin Function and Induction of Tyrosine Phosphorylation by the Autonomously Expressed B1 Integrin Cytoplamic Domain, pages 18311-18314. | [Y] - THE JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, 1995, Vol. 130, No. 5, SCHALLER, "Focal Adhesion Kinase and Paxillin Bind to Peptides Mimicking B Integrin Cytoplasmic Doimains", pages 1181-1187. |