Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0863841

EP0863841 - ELEVATOR SHUTTLE EMPLOYING HORIZONTALLY TRANSFERRED CAB [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Otis Elevator Company
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/38]For all designated states
OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY
10 Farm Springs
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BITTAR, Joseph
31 Longview Road
Avon, CT 06001 / US
[1998/38]
Representative(s)Hirsch, Peter , et al
Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/38]Hirsch, Peter , et al
Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
Application number, filing date96936920.625.10.1996
[1998/38]
WO1996US17040
Priority number, dateUS1995056475429.11.1995         Original published format: US 564754
[1998/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9719885
Date:05.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0863841
Date:16.09.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.1997
[1998/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0863841
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:B66B9/00
[1998/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/38]
TitleGerman:EINE HORIZONTAL ÜBERTRAGBARE KABINE VERWENDENDER AUFZUG IM PENDELVERKEHR[1998/38]
English:ELEVATOR SHUTTLE EMPLOYING HORIZONTALLY TRANSFERRED CAB[1998/38]
French:ASCENSEUR NAVETTE UTILISANT UNE CABINE A DEPLACEMENT HORIZONTAL[1998/38]
Entry into regional phase22.04.1998National basic fee paid 
22.04.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
22.04.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.06.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.04.1998Examination requested  [1998/38]
12.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.1999Fee for grant paid
20.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0615946  (INVENTIO AG [CH]) [A] 1,3,5 * abstract * * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]DE2203864  (BORST ADOLF H) [A] 1,3,5 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]WO9108161  (PA CONSULTING SERVICES [GB], et al) [A] 1,3,5 * abstract * * figure 1; claim - *;
 [A]JPH06156928  ;
 [A]JPH06156939
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940912), vol. 018, no. 487, Database accession no. (M - 1671), [A] 1,3,5 * abstract *