Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0868128

EP0868128 - HANDLE FOR A STICK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lenhart, Klaus
Mittlerer Weg 23
73275 Ohmden / DE
[2000/01]
Former [1998/41]For all designated states
LENHART, Klaus
Jesinger Strasse 84
D-73230 Kirchheim (Teck) / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/41]
Representative(s)DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/22]Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1998/41]Fuhlendorf, Jörn, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date96937234.125.10.1996
[1998/41]
WO1996EP04643
Priority number, dateDE1995220269U21.12.1995         Original published format: DE 29520269 U
[1998/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9723146
Date:03.07.1997
Language:DE
[1997/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0868128
Date:07.10.1998
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.1997
[1998/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0868128
Date:26.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.07.1997
ClassificationInternational:A45B9/02, A63C11/22
[1998/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1998/41]
TitleGerman:STOCKGRIFF[1998/41]
English:HANDLE FOR A STICK[1998/41]
French:POIGNEE DE BATON[1998/41]
Entry into regional phase11.02.1998National basic fee paid 
11.02.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
11.02.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.03.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/41]
27.01.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.05.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.07.1999Fee for grant paid
22.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR26.01.2000
GB26.01.2000
IT26.01.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2006/14]FR26.01.2000
GB26.01.2000
Former [2001/12]GB26.01.2000
FR23.06.2000
Former [2001/09]FR23.06.2000
Cited inInternational search[DA]DE9218655U  (LENHART KLAUS [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2906312  (EXEL OY);
 [A]IT630919  (MINGUZZI)