Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0858408

EP0858408 - SERVO STEERING FOR MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.12.2000
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 07.08.2002  [2002/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
[1999/14]
Former [1998/34]For all designated states
Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft
Postfach 80 02 30
70546 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BOHNER, Hubert
Arndtstrasse 39
D-71032 Böblingen / DE
02 / MOSER, Martin
Bosslerstrasse 26
D-70736 Fellbach / DE
[1998/34]
Representative(s)Dahmen, Toni
DaimlerChrysler AG, FTP, C 106
70546 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/34]Dahmen, Toni, Dipl.-Ing.
c/o Daimler-Benz AG, FTP/S C 106
70546 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date96937309.131.10.1996
[1998/34]
WO1996EP04734
Priority number, dateDE199514095603.11.1995         Original published format: DE 19540956
[1998/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9717247
Date:15.05.1997
Language:DE
[1997/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0858408
Date:19.08.1998
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.1997
[1998/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0858408
Date:23.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.05.1997
ClassificationInternational:B62D5/06, B62D5/30
[1998/34]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/34]
TitleGerman:SERVOLENKUNG FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE[1998/34]
English:SERVO STEERING FOR MOTOR VEHICLES[1998/34]
French:DIRECTION ASSISTEE POUR VEHICULES A MOTEUR[1998/34]
Entry into regional phase15.04.1998National basic fee paid 
15.04.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
15.04.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.05.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.04.1998Examination requested  [1998/34]
07.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.1999Fee for grant paid
23.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR23.02.2000
GB31.10.2000
[2002/32]
Former [2002/12]GB31.10.2000
Cited inInternational search[DXA]WO9012723  (LOTUS GROUP PLC [GB]) [DX] 1,3 * page 5, line 28 - page 8, line 13 * * page 9, line 1 - line 17 * * page 17, line 3 - page 18, line 10 * * page 22, line 6 - page 23, line 1 * * page 24, paragraph L * * figure 1 * [A] 4;
 [A]JPH0419271  ;
 [DA]DE4409928  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1,2,4 * column 3, line 3 - column 5, line 18; figure 1 *;
 [A]JPH03295765
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920428), vol. 016, no. 177, Database accession no. (M - 1241), [A] 1,5 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920406), vol. 016, no. 135, Database accession no. (M - 1230), [A] 1 * abstract *