Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0806259

EP0806259 - APPARATUS FOR BORING WEB OF SHAPE STEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.08.2003
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.10.2003  [2003/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OMI KOGYO CO., LTD.
27-7 Shinmei-cho Anjo-shi
Aichi-ken 446 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/46]For all designated states
OMI KOGYO CO., LTD.
27-7 Shinmei-cho
Anjo-shi Aichi-ken 446 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OMI, Shohei
50, Koyama,Shinden-cho,Anjo-shi
Aichi-ken 446 / JP
02 / URASHIMA, Chikayuki
7-5, Chiyogasaki 1-chome,Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka-ken 807 / JP
03 / ISHIKAWA, Taro
2-45, Kongo 3-chome,Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka-ken 807 / JP
 [2003/01]
Former [1997/46]01 / OMI, Shohei
50, Koyama,Shinden-cho,Anjo-shi
Aichi-ken 446 / JP
02 / URASHIMA-Chikayuki
7-5, Chiyogasaki 1-chome,Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka-ken 807 / JP
03 / ISHIKAWA, Taro
2-45, Kongo 3-chome,Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka-ken 807 / JP
Representative(s)Wennborg, Göte
Kransell & Wennborg AB Box 27834
115 93 Stockholm / SE
[1997/46]
Application number, filing date96937516.107.11.1996
[1997/46]
WO1996JP03255
Priority number, dateJP1995031751609.11.1995         Original published format: JP 31751695
[1997/46]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9717156
Date:15.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0806259
Date:12.11.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.1997
[1997/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.05.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:B23Q9/00, B23B41/00
[2000/27]
Former International [1997/46]B23B41/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [1997/46]
TitleGerman:GERÄT ZUM BOHREN VON STAHLPROFIL[1997/46]
English:APPARATUS FOR BORING WEB OF SHAPE STEEL[1997/46]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PERCAGE DE L'AME D'UN PROFILE D'ACIER[1997/46]
Entry into regional phase28.07.1997Translation filed 
28.07.1997National basic fee paid 
28.07.1997Search fee paid 
28.07.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.1997Examination requested  [1998/03]
10.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/41]
08.05.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
06.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
14.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
12.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200207   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]JPH05345210  (YAMAZAKI HAGURUMA SEISAKUSHO K);
 [X]JPS5969841U