Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0801926

EP0801926 - CLINICAL RADIATION THERMOMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  21.11.2003
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 07.01.2004  [2004/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CITIZEN WATCH CO. LTD.
1-12, Tanashicho 6-chome, Nishitokyo-shi
Tokyo 188-8511 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/16]For all designated states
Citizen Watch Co. Ltd.
1-12, Tanashicho 6-chome, Nishitokyo-shi
Tokyo 188-8511 / JP
Former [1997/44]For all designated states
CITIZEN WATCH CO., LTD.
1-1 Nishishinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-Ku Tokyo 163-04 / JP
Former [1997/43]For all designated states
CITIZEN WATCH CO. LTD.
1-1 Nishishinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-Ku Tokyo 163-04 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / EGAWA, Shunji
904-1, Kitahara-cho
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama 359 / JP
[1997/43]
Representative(s)Moir, Michael Christopher , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP
120 Holborn
London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/43]Moir, Michael Christopher , et al
Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date96937521.107.11.1996
[1997/43]
WO1996JP03261
Priority number, dateJP1995029411713.11.1995         Original published format: JP 29411795
[1997/43]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9717887
Date:22.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0801926
Date:22.10.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1997
[1997/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP22.05.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/00, G01J5/10, G01K13/00, G01K15/00
[1999/22]
Former International [1997/43]A61B5/00, G01J5/10
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1997/43]
TitleGerman:KLINISCHES STRAHLUNGSTHERMOMETER[1997/43]
English:CLINICAL RADIATION THERMOMETER[1997/43]
French:THERMOMETRE MEDICAL A RAYONNEMENT[1997/43]
Entry into regional phase16.07.1997Translation filed 
11.07.1997National basic fee paid 
11.07.1997Search fee paid 
11.07.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/43]
14.11.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
21.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
23.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
22.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[YA]WO9303666  (DIATEK INC) [Y] 1-4,18 * page 7, line 6 - page 15, column 34 * [A] 5,15,16,19,20;
 [YA]EP0411121  (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [Y] 1-4,18 * column 10, line 52 - column 4, line 44 * * column 15, line 45 - column 19, line 53 * [A] 7,10
International search[Y]JPH06142063  ;
 [Y]JPH05115443  ;
 [Y]JPH0228524  ;
 [Y]JPS60119179  ;
 [Y]JPH06300635  ;
 [Y]JPH07178061  ;
 [Y]US5159936  ;
 [Y]JPH06502099