EP0861856 - FINE POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENE POWDER AND PRODUCTION AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.03.2002 [2002/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED Umeda Center Building, 4-12 Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/36] | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED Umeda Center Building, 4-12 Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAHARA, Takahiro, Daikin Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Nishi Hitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka-fu 566 / JP | 02 /
HOSOKAWA, Kazutaka, Daikin Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Nishi Hitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka-fu 566 / JP | 03 /
SHIMIZU, Tetsuo, Daikin Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Nishi Hitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka-fu 566 / JP | [1998/36] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/36] | Barz, Peter, Dr. Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96937550.0 | 08.11.1996 | [1998/36] | WO1996JP03299 | Priority number, date | JP19950317312 | 09.11.1995 Original published format: JP 31731295 | JP19960237282 | 19.08.1996 Original published format: JP 23728296 | [1998/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9717382 | Date: | 15.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0861856 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0861856 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.05.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08F14/26, C08L101/00, // (C08L101/00, 27:18) | [1999/20] | CPC: |
C08J3/16 (EP,US);
C08F14/26 (EP,KR,US);
C08F6/14 (KR);
C08L101/00 (EP,KR,US);
C09K21/14 (EP,US);
C09K3/22 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F14/26, C08F2/16 (EP,US);
C08L101/00, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1998/36] | C08F14/26, C08F6/14, C08L101/00, C09K3/22, C09K21/14, // (C08L101/00, 27:18) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/36] | Title | German: | FEINES POLYTETRAFLUORETHYLENPULVER, SEINE HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNGEN | [1998/36] | English: | FINE POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENE POWDER AND PRODUCTION AND USES THEREOF | [1998/36] | French: | POUDRE FINE DE POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENE, SA FABRICATION ET SON UTILISATION | [1998/36] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.1998 | Translation filed | 22.04.1998 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.1998 | Search fee paid | 22.04.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 22.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/36] | 15.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.09.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3535301 (GROPPELLI GIOVANNI, et al) [A] 1-3* example -; table - * | International search | [A]JPS6116907 (DU PONT); | [A]JPH05287151 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD, et al) |