Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0806005

EP0806005 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR OPERATING A MASS MEMORY STORAGE PERIPHERAL COMPUTER DEVICE CONNECTED TO A HOST COMPUTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.01.2004
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Texas Instruments Incorporated
7839 Churchill Way
Mail Station 3999
Dallas, Texas 75251 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/32]For all designated states
Texas Instruments Incorporated
7839 Churchill Way, Mail Station 3999
Dallas, Texas 75251 / US
Former [1997/46]For all designated states
Intersect Technologies Inc.
Suite F, 1250 Hover Road
Longmont, CO 80501 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CORNABY, Stephen, R.
8982 Comanche Road
Niwot, CO 80503 / US
02 / HARMER, Tracy, D.
1612 Ashcroft Court
Longmont, CO 80501 / US
[1997/46]
Representative(s)Legg, Cyrus James Grahame , et al
Abel & Imray
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/46]Legg, Cyrus James Grahame , et al
ABEL & IMRAY, Northumberland House, 303-306 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date96937864.531.10.1996
[1997/46]
WO1996US17550
Priority number, dateUS1995055302403.11.1995         Original published format: US 553024
[1997/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9718505
Date:22.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/22]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0806005
Date:12.11.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1997
[1997/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0806005
Date:26.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.06.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/44, G06F3/06, G06F13/10, G06F9/445
[1999/03]
Former International [1997/46]G06F9/44
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1997/46]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUM BETRIEB EINES MIT EINEM HAUPTRECHNER VERBUNDENEN MASSENSPEICHER-COMPUTERPERIPHERIEGERÄTES[1997/46]
English:METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR OPERATING A MASS MEMORY STORAGE PERIPHERAL COMPUTER DEVICE CONNECTED TO A HOST COMPUTER[1997/46]
French:PROCEDE ET AGENCEMENT PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE PERIPHERIQUE DE STOCKAGE D'UNE MEMOIRE DE GRANDE CAPACITE CONNECTE A UN ORDINATEUR CENTRAL[1997/46]
Entry into regional phase28.07.1997National basic fee paid 
28.07.1997Search fee paid 
28.07.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.1997Examination requested  [1998/09]
10.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.11.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
18.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.2002Fee for grant paid
20.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.12.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12]
Request for further processing for:18.01.2002Request for further processing filed
21.01.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.02.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200005   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2001
31.10.200106   M06   Fee paid on   02.05.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR26.03.2003
IT26.03.2003
NL26.03.2003
[2008/06]
Former [2006/32]FR26.03.2003
NL26.03.2003
Former [2004/01]NL26.03.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]US5412798  (GARNEY JOHN I [US]) [A] 1-20 * column 4, line 33 - column 22, line 23 *;
 [A]US5319751  (GARNEY JOHN I) [A] 1-20 * column 3, line 23 - column 14, line 51 *;
 [A]US5371885  (LETWIN JAMES G) [A] 1-20 * column 11, line 39 - column 12, line 7; figure 5 *
International search[X]US5237689  ;
 [Y]US5319751  ;
 [Y]US5412798  ;
 [A]US5430845  ;
 [A]US5355498