Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0848831

EP0848831 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING AND MONITORING A PARTIAL SPACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.2002
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRW Automotive Electronics & Components GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 2-8
78315 Radolfzell / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
TRW Automotive Electronics & Components GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 2-8
78315 Radolfzell / DE
Former [1998/26]For all designated states
TRW FAHRZEUGELEKTRIK GmbH & CO. KG
Industriestrasse 2-8
78315 Radolfzell / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHWEIZER, Karl
Fichtenweg 10
D-71297 Mönsheim / DE
[1998/26]
Representative(s)Eder, Thomas , et al
Eder Schieschke & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Elisabethstrasse 34/II
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/26]Eder, Thomas, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Eder & Schieschke, Patentanwälte, Elisabethstrasse 34
80796 München / DE
Application number, filing date96938003.909.09.1996
[1998/26]
WO1996DE01691
Priority number, dateDE199513331608.09.1995         Original published format: DE 19533316
[1998/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9709639
Date:13.03.1997
Language:DE
[1997/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0848831
Date:24.06.1998
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.1997
[1998/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0848831
Date:12.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.03.1997
ClassificationInternational:G01S15/88, B60R21/00, G01S15/04, G01S15/52
[1998/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   PT,   SE [1998/26]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG UND ÜBERWACHUNG EINES TEILRAUMES[1998/26]
English:PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING AND MONITORING A PARTIAL SPACE[1998/26]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION ET DE SURVEILLANCE D'UN ESPACE PARTIEL[1998/26]
Entry into regional phase13.02.1998National basic fee paid 
13.02.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
13.02.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.04.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/26]
21.10.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.12.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.09.2001Fee for grant paid
20.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)13.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
03.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
03.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT12.12.2001
PT12.03.2002
SE12.03.2002
ES27.06.2002
[2008/06]
Former [2004/04]PT12.03.2002
SE12.03.2002
ES27.06.2002
Former [2002/48]PT12.03.2002
SE12.03.2002
Former [2002/27]SE12.03.2002
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE4325748  (AUDI AG [DE]) [Y] 1,5-7,10,14-17,19,20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5235316  (QUALIZZA GREGORY K [US]) [A] 2,3,11 * abstract *;
 [A]US4122430  (LEISTERER REINHARD, et al) [A] 4,12 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2173595  (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK) [A] 8,9 * abstract *;
 [A]DE3003887  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 13 * figure - *;
 [A]EP0617186  (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [A] 18 * abstract *;
 [DA]DE3802159  (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [DA] 1,10
 [Y]  - KLEEMAN L ET AL, "AN OPTIMAL SONAR ARRAY FOR TARGET LOCALIZATION AND CLASSIFICATION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMAT, SAN DIEGO, MAY 8 - 13, 1994, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19940508), VOL. 4, no. CONF. 11, pages 3130 - 3135, XP000481127 [Y] 1,5-7,10,14-17,19,20 * page 3130 - page 3131 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ROBOT.1994.351089