blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0861167

EP0861167 - STEERING COLUMN ASSEMBLY SWITCH WITH CONTACTS WHICH CAN PIVOT PARALLEL TO ONE ANOTHER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.2000
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ITT Automotive Europe GmbH
Guerickestrasse 7
60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[1998/36]
Inventor(s)01 / ENGELHARDT, Martin
Hauptstrasse 61/1
D-74246 Eberstadt / DE
02 / HECHT, Walter
Fichtestrasse 8
D-74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
03 / KLEIN, Rudolf
Trollingerweg 3
D-74348 Lauffen / DE
[1999/01]
Former [1998/36]01 / ENGELHARDT, Martin
Hauptstrasse 61/1
D-74246 Eberstadt / DE
02 / HECHT, Walter
Sudetenstrasse 86
D-74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE
03 / KLEIN, Rudolf
Trollingerweg 3
D-74348 Lauffen / DE
Representative(s)DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker
Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1999/09]Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1998/36]Portwich, Peter
c/o Alfred Teves GmbH, Guerickestrasse 7
6000 Frankfurt am Main 90 / DE
Application number, filing date96938127.607.11.1996
[1998/36]
WO1996EP04863
Priority number, dateDE199514444429.11.1995         Original published format: DE 19544444
[1998/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9719831
Date:05.06.1997
Language:DE
[1997/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0861167
Date:02.09.1998
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0861167
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.06.1997
ClassificationIPC:B60Q1/14, H01H25/04
[1998/36]
CPC:
B60Q1/1469 (EP); H01H25/04 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES [1998/36]
TitleGerman:LENKSTOCKSCHALTER MIT PARALLEL ZUEINANDER VERSCHWENKBAREN KONTAKTEN[1998/36]
English:STEERING COLUMN ASSEMBLY SWITCH WITH CONTACTS WHICH CAN PIVOT PARALLEL TO ONE ANOTHER[1998/36]
French:INTERRUPTEUR SUR COLONNE DE DIRECTION A CONTACTS PIVOTANT PARALLELEMENT LES UNS AUX AUTRES[1998/36]
Entry into regional phase29.06.1998National basic fee paid 
29.06.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
29.06.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.06.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/36]
30.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.08.1999Fee for grant paid
04.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
05.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES12.01.2000
[2002/27]
Cited inInternational search[Y]GB1257941  (N.S.F.) [Y] 1-3 * page 3, line 36 - line 51 *;
 [Y]EP0533565  (JAEGER [FR]) [Y] 1-3* figure 2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.