Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0867191

EP0867191 - DRUG COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.12.2005
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.01.2006  [2006/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Astellas Pharma Inc.
3-11, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/35]For all designated states
Astellas Pharma Inc.
3-11, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [1998/40]For all designated states
YAMANOUCHI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
3-11 Nihonbashi-Honcho, 2-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HASHIMOTO, Yoshimi
9-4, Ohiwa 4-chome
Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 420 / JP
02 / SHIOZAWA, Hiroyoshi
15-4, Surugadai 3-chome
Fujieda-shi, Shizuoka 426 / JP
03 / KISHIMOTO, Hideyuki
1-34, Higashi-cho
Fujieda-shi, Shizuoka 426 / JP
04 / SETOGUCHI, Yoichi
8-32, Aoba-cho 4-chome
Fujieda-shi, Shizuoka 426 / JP
[1998/40]
Representative(s)Geering, Keith Edwin
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London
WC1X 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/40]Geering, Keith Edwin
REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date96938540.026.11.1996
[1998/40]
WO1996JP03450
Priority number, dateJP1995030751227.11.1995         Original published format: JP 30751295
[1998/40]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9719699
Date:05.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0867191
Date:30.09.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.1997
[1998/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.06.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K45/00, A61K31/415, A61K31/34, A61K31/425
[1998/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/40]
TitleGerman:MEDIKAMENTENZUSAMMENSETZUNG[1998/40]
English:DRUG COMPOSITION[1998/40]
French:COMPOSITION DE MEDICAMENT[1998/40]
Entry into regional phase02.06.1998Translation filed 
15.06.1998National basic fee paid 
15.06.1998Search fee paid 
15.06.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
15.06.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
15.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/40]
28.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/03]
19.08.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0600725  (MCNEIL PPC INC [US]) [X] 1-9 * examples I-V; claims 1-9 *;
 [A]WO9516446  (NIPPON GLAXO LIMITED [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 6, lines 17-21; claims 1-10 *;
 [A]US4605551  (BUEHLER JOHN D [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 56; examples 1-4; claims 1-8 *;
 [A]JPS59210012
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850403), vol. 009, no. 074, Database accession no. (C - 273), & JP59210012 A 19841128 (TAKEDA YAKUHIN KOGYO KK) [A] 1-9 * abstract *
International search[A]EP0286781  (HEUMANN PHARMA GMBH & CO [DE])