blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0858623 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0858623



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 372
09.05.1997 Priority document Search / examination 54
09.05.1997 Priority document Search / examination 78
09.05.1997 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 94
09.05.1997 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
08.07.1997 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
28.04.1998 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
28.04.1998 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
28.04.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.06.1998 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
24.02.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
24.02.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.02.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
02.03.2000 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
04.04.2000 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
17.10.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.10.2000 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
16.02.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.02.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
27.04.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
02.05.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.05.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
24.09.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
18.02.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 72
18.02.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.02.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
22.04.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
29.04.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
25.07.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 8
26.07.2002 Reply to communication about intention to grant Search / examination 10
29.07.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
29.07.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
29.07.2002 Reply to communication about intention to grant Search / examination 1
29.07.2002 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 2
29.08.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.11.2002 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
13.08.2003 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
16.07.2007 Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore Search / examination 1