blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0858623


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
06.06.2008 Change - representative published on  09.07.2008  [2008/28]
15.08.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  01.10.2003  [2003/40]
23.08.2002 (Expected) grant published on  09.10.2002  [2002/41]
07.08.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
25.04.2002 Communication of intention to grant
25.04.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
12.02.2002 Communication of intention to grant
18.10.2001 Renewal fee
04.05.2001 Examination report or reply
21.02.2001 Examination report or reply
23.10.2000 Renewal fee
13.10.2000 First examination report
12.10.2000 Examination report or reply
25.02.2000 Supplementary search report published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
25.02.2000 Change - classification published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
22.10.1999 Renewal fee
03.07.1998 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.08.1998 [1998/34]
03.07.1998 Request for examination filed published on  19.08.1998 [1998/34]
19.05.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
14.05.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
14.05.1998 Renewal fee
07.05.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
05.07.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
21.06.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
21.12.1996 PCT data prior to European publication