blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0858623

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 DE 
 ES 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
 NL 
Examination procedure25.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase05.05.1998National basic fee paid 
05.05.1998Search fee paid 
05.05.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
05.05.1998Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted09.10.2002
Opposition procedure10.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit published on 01.10.2003 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:19.08.1998 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:19.08.1998 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19980505
 
Event date:12.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A4
Designated State(s):AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:12.04.2000 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20000224
 
Event date:12.04.2000 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
Free Format Text:7G 05B 11/01 A, 7G 05B 19/18 B, 7G 05B 19/29 B, 7A 61B 1/00 B
 
Event date:29.11.2000 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20001017
 
Event date:09.10.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL
 
Event date:09.10.2002 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:225949
Country of Ref Document:AT
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20021015
Kind Code of Ref Document:T
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:09.10.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:14.11.2002 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69624254
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20021114
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:02.05.2003 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:16.06.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2187681 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:01.10.2003 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20030710
 
Event date:03.10.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20041003
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:13.10.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20041013
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:16.11.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20041116
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:17.12.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20041217
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.10.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20051031
 
Event date:31.10.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20051031
 
Event date:02.11.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20051102
 
Event date:01.05.2006 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20060501
 
Event date:03.07.2006 
Event description:NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20060501
 
Event date:16.01.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20051102
 
Event date:31.12.2007 
Event description:BE: LAPSED
Owner Name:*SMITH & NEPHEW INC.
Effective DATE:20051031
 
Event date:23.09.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.11.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20150923
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.01.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20151026
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.01.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20151028
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.01.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20151028
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69624254 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:23.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20161030
 
Event date:31.01.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20161030