Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0858623

EP0858623 - MOTOR CONTROLLED SURGICAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.08.2003
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 09.07.2008  [2008/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMITH & NEPHEW, INC.
1450 Brooks Road
Memphis, TN 38116 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/34]For all designated states
SMITH & NEPHEW, INC.
1450 Brooks Road
Memphis, Tennessee 38116 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BRODSKY, Michael, A.
17 Gould Pond Road
Hillsboro, NH 03244 / US
02 / KRAUSE, Kenneth, W.
14 Phillipswood Road
Sandown, NH 03873 / US
[1998/34]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Harrison Goddard Foote
Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds
LS2 8DD / GB
Former [1998/34]Harrison Goddard Foote
Belmont House, 20 Wood Lane
Leeds LS6 2AE / GB
Application number, filing date96938751.331.10.1996
[1998/34]
WO1996US17651
Priority number, dateUS19950007133P31.10.1995         Original published format: US 7133 P
US1996063035810.04.1996         Original published format: US 630358
[1998/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9716774
Date:09.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0858623
Date:19.08.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.1997
[1998/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0858623
Date:09.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.05.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:G05B11/01, G05B19/18, G05B19/29, A61B1/00
[2000/15]
Former International [1998/34]G05B11/01, G05B19/18, G05B19/29
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1998/34]
TitleGerman:MOTORGESTEUERTES CHIRURGISCHES SYSTEM[1998/34]
English:MOTOR CONTROLLED SURGICAL SYSTEM[1998/34]
French:SYSTEME CHIRURGICAL COMMANDE A MOTEUR[1998/34]
Entry into regional phase05.05.1998National basic fee paid 
05.05.1998Search fee paid 
05.05.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
05.05.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.05.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.05.1998Examination requested  [1998/34]
17.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.07.2002Fee for grant paid
25.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US5217478  (REXROTH FRED [US]) [X] 1 * column 6, line 33 - column 14, line 65; figure 12 *
International search[Y]US4821586  (SCORDATO RICHARD E [US], et al)