EP0865709 - SELECTIVE CALL TRANSCEIVER AND METHOD OF RE-REGISTERING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.2003 [2003/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1998/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AYERST, Douglas, I. 111 N.W. 11th Street Delray Beach, FL 33444 / US | 02 /
GOODMAN, Robert, Gary 1925 Parkside Drive Denton, TX 76201 / US | 03 /
STARKWEATHER, James, A. 2409 Brittany Lane Grapevine, TX 76051 / US | [1998/39] | Representative(s) | Morgan, Marc, et al Motorola European IP Operations Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/39] | Morgan, Marc, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations, Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96938758.8 | 04.11.1996 | [1998/39] | WO1996US17667 | Priority number, date | US19950569813 | 08.12.1995 Original published format: US 569813 | [1998/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9722214 | Date: | 19.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0865709 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0865709 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.06.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/00, H04Q7/12, H04Q7/38 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
H04W84/025 (EP,US);
H04B5/00 (KR);
H04W60/04 (EP,US);
H04W88/185 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/39] | H04Q7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/39] | Title | German: | SELEKTIV-RUF SENDE-EMPFÄNGER UND VERFAHREN ZUR NEU-REGISTRIERUNG DAFÜR | [1998/39] | English: | SELECTIVE CALL TRANSCEIVER AND METHOD OF RE-REGISTERING SAME | [1998/39] | French: | EMETTEUR-RECEPTEUR D'APPEL SELECTIF ET PROCEDE DE REENREGISTREMENT CORRESPONDANT | [1998/39] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.1998 | Search fee paid | 08.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/39] | 23.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0472349 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1,6,9,13* column 2, line 27 - line 44 *; | [XA] - MARKOULIDAKIS J G ET AL, "PERIODIC ATTACHMENT IN FUTURE MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19950801), vol. 44, no. 3, ISSN 0018-9545, pages 555 - 564, XP000526046 [X] 1,4,5,9-13 * page 555, column L, line 39 - line 42 * * page 555, column R, line 13 - line 33 * * page 562, column R, line 13 - line 19 * [A] 6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/25.406622 | International search | [Y]US4845491 (FASCENDA ANTHONY C [US], et al); | [YE]US5594943 (BALACHANDRAN KUMAR [US]) |