Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0861558

EP0861558 - ELECTRONIC PROGRAM GUIDE WITH ENHANCED PRESENTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.07.2001
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 30.09.2009  [2009/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mindport B.V.
P.O. Box 3047
2130 KA Hoofddorp / NL
[1999/42]
Former [1998/36]For all designated states
Hyundai Electronics America, Inc.
3101 North First Street
San Jose, CA 95134 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BEDARD, Karen
2275 Glenkirk Drive
San Jose, CA 95124 / US
[1998/36]
Representative(s)de Vries, Johannes Hendrik Fokke
De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
[2009/40]
Former [1999/42]de Vries, Johannes Hendrik Fokke
De Vries & Metman, Gebouw Autumn, Overschiestraat 184 N
1062 XK Amsterdam / NL
Former [1998/36]Sparing - Röhl - Henseler Patentanwälte
Postfach 14 04 43
40074 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date96938837.012.11.1996
[1998/36]
WO1996US18114
Priority number, dateUS1995055662413.11.1995         Original published format: US 556624
US1996062717603.04.1996         Original published format: US 627176
[1998/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9718670
Date:22.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0861558
Date:02.09.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1997
[1998/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0861558
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.05.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/50, H04N5/445
[1998/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1998/36]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHE PROGRAMMANWEISUNG MIT VERBESSERTER DARSTELLUNG[1998/36]
English:ELECTRONIC PROGRAM GUIDE WITH ENHANCED PRESENTATION[1998/36]
French:GUIDE DE PROGRAMME ELECTRONIQUE A PRESENTATION AMELIOREE[1998/36]
Entry into regional phase20.05.1998National basic fee paid 
20.05.1998Search fee paid 
20.05.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
20.05.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.03.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
20.05.1998Examination requested  [1998/36]
02.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.09.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.03.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2000Fee for grant paid
15.05.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US5436676  (PINT CHARLES S [US], et al) [A] 1,10,16 * figure 3 *;
 [A]US5410326  (GOLDSTEIN STEVEN W [US]) [A] 1,10,16 * figure 1 *
International search[YP]US5539479  (BERTRAM RANDAL L [US]);
 [YE]US5585866  (MILLER LARRY [US], et al);
 [YP]US5559550  (MANKOVITZ ROY J [US]);
 [YP]US5585838  (LAWLER FRANK A [US], et al);
 [A]US4663615  (HERNANDEZ IRENE H [US], et al);
 [Y]US4591840  (CURTIS DONALD E, et al)