Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0853588

EP0853588 - CONTAINER CLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.2000
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Goetz, Anja
Wangenheimstrasse 38 A
14193 Berlin / DE
For all designated states
Fleckenstein, Christoph
Wangenheimstrasse 38 A
14193 Berlin / DE
[1998/30]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/30]
Representative(s)Schuster, Gregor
Patentanwälte
Schuster & Thul
Wiederholdstrasse 10
70174 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/30]Schuster, Gregor, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Schuster & Thul Wiederholdstrasse 10
70174 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date96938960.002.10.1996
[1998/30]
WO1996DE01893
Priority number, dateDE199513722106.10.1995         Original published format: DE 19537221
[1998/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9713702
Date:17.04.1997
Language:DE
[1997/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0853588
Date:22.07.1998
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.1997
[1998/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0853588
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:B65D47/08
[1999/14]
Former International [1998/30]B65D47/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1998/30]
TitleGerman:BEHÄLTERVERSCHLUSS[1998/30]
English:CONTAINER CLOSURE[1998/30]
French:DISPOSITIF DE FERMETURE D'UN RECIPIENT[1998/30]
Entry into regional phase06.05.1998National basic fee paid 
06.05.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
06.05.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.05.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.05.1998Examination requested  [1998/30]
24.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.05.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.1999Fee for grant paid
21.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0081124  (CREANOVA AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,7-9 * page 4, line 34 - page 5, line 23; figures 2A-2D *;
 [A]US5358154  (HALM HANS [DE]) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 5 - line 37; figure - *;
 [A]CH427631  (BONNEFOY PIERRE EDOUARD LOUIS [FR]) [A] 1-9 * page 2, line 5 - line 90; figure - *;
 [A]US4386720  (SPEEDIE ROBERT [AU]) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 9; figure - *;
 [A]US1959206  (HARTOG PAUL D) [A] 1-9 * page 1, line 38 - line 56; figure - *