Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0865465

EP0865465 - LACCASES WITH IMPROVED DYEING PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2002
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.05.2002  [2002/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novozymes A/S
Krogsho̸jvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
[N/P]
Former [2001/04]For all designated states
Novozymes A/S
Krogshoejvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Former [1998/39]For all designated states
NOVO NORDISK A/S
Novo Allé
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Inventor(s)01 / AASLYNG, Dorrit
Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Allé
DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
02 / SOERENSEN, Niels Henrik
Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Allé
DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
03 / ROERBAEK, Karen
Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Allé
DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
[1998/39]
Application number, filing date96938989.929.11.1996
[1998/39]
WO1996DK00499
Priority number, dateDK1995000135730.11.1995         Original published format: DK 135795
[1998/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9719999
Date:05.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0865465
Date:23.09.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.1997
[1998/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0865465
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE05.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:C09B67/00, A61K7/13
[1998/39]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1998/39]
TitleGerman:LACCASEN MIT VERBESSERTEN FÄRBEEIGENSCHAFTEN[1998/39]
English:LACCASES WITH IMPROVED DYEING PROPERTIES[1998/39]
French:LACCASE AVEC DES PROPRIETES COLORANTES AMELIOREES[1998/39]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase30.06.1998National basic fee paid 
30.06.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.06.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/39]
03.11.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.02.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
06.11.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
28.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.2001Fee for grant paid
08.03.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XP]WO9533836  (NOVO NORDISK BIOTECH INC [US], et al);
 [XP]WO9533837  (NOVO NORDISK BIOTECH INC [US]);
 [X]EP0504005  (PERMA SA [FR]);
 [X]WO9600290  (NOVO NORDISK BIOTECH INC [US], et al);
 [X]JP03077813  ;
 [A]US3251742  (SAUL SOLOWAY);
 [A]WO9507988  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al);
 [A]DE4314317  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]);
 [A]WO9400100  (OREAL [FR], et al)
 [X]  - STN INTERNATIONAL, File CAPLUS, CAPLUS Accession No. 1991:498981, SARUNO, RINJIRO: "Hair-Dyeing Preparations Containing Melanin or Other Polyphenol Pigments and Manufacture of the Pigments"; & JP,A,03 077 813, (03-04-91).,
 [X]  - STN INTERNATIONAL, File CAPLUS, CAPLUS Accession No. 1995:974547, CHUVUKULA, MURALIKRISHNA et al., "Phenolic Azo Dye Oxidation by Laccase From Pyricularia Oryzae"; & APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL. (1995), 61(12), 4374-77.,