Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0861160

EP0861160 - METHOD OF ALLOCATING TRANSMITTERS TO RECEIVING ANTENNAS IN TYRE-PRESSURE MONITORING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 22.07.2009  [2009/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beru AG
Mörikestrasse 155
71636 Ludwigsburg / DE
[1999/50]
Former [1999/33]For all designated states
AMI DODUCO GmbH
Im Altgefäll 12
75181 Pforzheim / DE
Former [1998/36]For all designated states
DODUCO GmbH
Im Altgefäll 12
75181 Pforzheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / NORMANN, Norbert
Panoramastrasse 12
D-75223 Niefern-Öschelbronn / DE
02 / KESSLER, Ralf
Lessingstrasse 12
D-76237 Söllingen / DE
03 / SCHULZE, Gunter
Lutherstrasse 3
D-75228 Ispringen / DE
[1998/36]
Representative(s)Twelmeier, Ulrich , et al
Zerrennerstrasse 23-25
75172 Pforzheim / DE
[2009/30]
Former [1998/36]Twelmeier, Ulrich, Dipl. Phys. , et al
Patentanwalt, Zerrennerstrasse 23-25
75172 Pforzheim / DE
Application number, filing date96939051.715.11.1996
[1998/36]
WO1996EP05021
Priority number, dateDE199514283317.11.1995         Original published format: DE 19542833
DE199610847805.03.1996         Original published format: DE 19608478
[1998/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9718962
Date:29.05.1997
Language:DE
[1997/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0861160
Date:02.09.1998
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.1997
[1998/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0861160
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.05.1997
ClassificationInternational:B60C23/04
[1998/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1998/36]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ZUORDNUNG VON SENDERN ZU EMPFANGSANTENNEN BEI REIFENDRUCKÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEMEN[1998/36]
English:METHOD OF ALLOCATING TRANSMITTERS TO RECEIVING ANTENNAS IN TYRE-PRESSURE MONITORING SYSTEMS[1998/36]
French:PROCEDE D'ATTRIBUTION D'EMETTEURS A DES ANTENNES DE RECEPTIONS DANS DES SYSTEMES DE SURVEILLANCE DE LA PRESSION DES PNEUS[1998/36]
Entry into regional phase02.04.1998National basic fee paid 
02.04.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
02.04.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.04.1998Examination requested  [1998/36]
29.01.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.10.1999Fee for grant paid
05.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.199904   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9420317  (SCHRADER AUTOMOTIVE INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 25 * * page 11, line 24 - page 12, line 20; figure 7 *;
 [DA]WO9316891  (UWATEC AG [CH], et al) [DA] 1 * page 19, paragraph 2; figure - *;
 [PA]WO9615919  (SCHRADER AUTOMOTIVE INC [US], et al) [PA] 1 * page 12, line 5 - line 12; figure - *
ExaminationWO9308036
 EP0763437