Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0812468

EP0812468 - A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A HIGH VOLTAGE GaN-AlN BASED SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE MADE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2003
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[2008/39]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Former [1997/51]For all designated states
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / TASKER, Nikhil, R.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / MENSZ, Piotr, M.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
03 / KHAN, Babar, A.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[1997/51]
Representative(s)Duijvestijn, Adrianus Johannes , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2002/18]Duijvestijn, Adrianus Johannes , et al
Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Former [1997/51]Smeets, Eugenius Theodorus J. M. , et al
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date96939258.806.12.1996
[1997/51]
WO1996IB01377
Priority number, dateUS1995058314828.12.1995         Original published format: US 583148
[1997/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9724752
Date:10.07.1997
Language:EN
[1997/30]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0812468
Date:17.12.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.1997
[1997/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0812468
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE28.08.1997
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/18, H01L29/205
[1997/51]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1997/51]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EINEM AUF GaN-AlN BASIERTEN HOCHSPANNUNGSHALBLEITERBAUELEMENT UND HERGESTELLTES HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT[2002/04]
English:A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A HIGH VOLTAGE GaN-AlN BASED SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE MADE[1997/51]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE SEMI-CONDUCTEUR GaN-AlN HAUTE TENSION ET SEMI-CONDUCTEUR OBTENU[1997/51]
Former [1997/51]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EINEM AUF GaN-A1N BASIERTEN HOCHSPANNUNGSHALBLEITERBAUELEMENT UND HERGESTELLTES HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT
Entry into regional phase29.09.1997National basic fee paid 
29.09.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
12.01.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.08.1997Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.01.1998Examination requested  [1998/12]
23.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.2002Fee for grant paid
23.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL27.11.2002
[2003/30]
Cited inInternational search[A]US5393993  (EDMOND JOHN A [US], et al);
 [A]US5369289  (TAMAKI MAKOTO [JP], et al);
 [A]US5192987  (KHAN MUHAMMED A [US], et al);
 [A]US5122845  (MANABE KATSUHIDE [JP], et al);
 [A]US4903088  (VAN OPDORP CHRISTIANUS J M [NL])
Examination   KHAN M.A. ET AL, "Current/voltage characteristic collapse in AlGaN/GaN heterostructure insulated gate field effect transistors at high drain bias", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, (19941208), vol. 30, no. 25, doi:doi:10.1049/el:19941461, pages 2175 - 2176, XP006001452

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19941461